Molinar v. Lumpkin et al
Petitioner: Victor Molinar
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 3:2022cv00379
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt of #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (jg1)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 Certified Mailing of #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (jg1)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application for In Forma Pauperis by Victor Molinar. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(dt)
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order (jg1)
November 18, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Mailing of #2 Order (jg1)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (NO FILING FEE OR MOTION FOR IFP), filed by Victor Molinar.(jg1)
October 24, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (jg1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molinar v. Lumpkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Molinar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?