Shipley v. Hijar
Petitioner: Marc Ryan Shipley
Respondent: Sandra Hijar
Case Number: 3:2023cv00011
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Certified Mail Receipt of #11 Certified Mailing (ep1)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Certified Mailing (ep1)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Certified Mailing of Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, (ep1)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. The filing fee has been waived, as stated in the Courts January 20, 2023, Order, ECF No. 3. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Certified Mailing of #3 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #4 Judgment (ep1)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter/Correspondence and request to file via CM/ECF. (ep1)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc Ryan Shipley (ep1)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marc Ryan Shipley. (ep1)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Certified Mailing (ep1)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certified Mailing of #3 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #4 Judgment (ep1)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 2 Ex Parte Motion filed by Sandra Hijar, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marc Ryan Shipley. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Motion for IFP not filed and filing fee not paid), filed by Marc Ryan Shipley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ep1)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (ep1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipley v. Hijar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marc Ryan Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandra Hijar
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?