Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC dba Helix Electric, a Nevada limited liability company, First Solar Electric LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC and First Solar Electric LLC
Defendant: BOE Insurance Companies I through X, ROE Corporations I through X, Zurich American Insurance Company and DOES I through X
Case Number: 4:2018cv00036
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Fitzgerald, Patrick)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by First Solar Electric LLC. (Moskowitz, Erik)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC. (Moskowitz, Erik)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik G. Moskowitz on behalf of Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC (Moskowitz, Erik)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Patrick J. Fitzgerald added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Fitzgerald, Patrick)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/21/2019 09:00 AM in Default hearing location for Pecos before Judge David Counts, Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 09:00 AM in Default hearing location for Pecos before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/21/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2019, Discovery due by 4/28/2019, Motions due by 5/31/2019,. Signed by Judge David Counts. (mb1)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling Order by Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, Erik)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC.(Moskowitz, Erik)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC. (Moskowitz, Erik)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Defenses, Motion to Dismiss, and Verified Denial by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Dancy, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to amend pleadings. Signed by Judge David Counts. (mb1)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling ORDER recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (mb1)
August 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (mb1)
August 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mb1)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL IN STATE COURT by Zurich American Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Dancy, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 Received, Receipt #0542-11166224), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Dancy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOE Insurance Companies I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROE Corporations I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Blair Dancy
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC dba Helix Electric, a Nevada limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Solar Electric LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helix Electric of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Erik G. Moskowitz
Represented By: Rebecca G. Moss
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Solar Electric LLC
Represented By: Erik G. Moskowitz
Represented By: Rebecca G. Moss
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?