Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Production Delivery Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company a/s/o Worldstage Inc. d/b/a Video Applications, Inc. and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Defendant: Production Delivery Services, Inc. d/b/a Production Transport and Production Delivery Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00007
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Recommendations by Production Delivery Services, Inc.. (Henry, Vic)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Schulze, Jason)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Production Delivery Services, Inc.. (Henry, Vic)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Vic Houston Henry added to party Production Delivery Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by Production Delivery Services, Inc..(Henry, Vic)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 APPENDIX to #1 Complaint, by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Schulze, Jason)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #5 Appendix (ab1)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPENDIX to #1 Complaint, by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Schulze, Jason)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Production Delivery Services, Inc. (jk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Complaint. (jk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company a/s/o Worldstage Inc. d/b/a Video Applications, Inc.. (Schulze, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jk)
February 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (jk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11791965). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company a/s/o Worldstage Inc. d/b/a Video Applications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulze, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Production Delivery Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company a/s/o Worldstage Inc. d/b/a Video Applications, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Steven Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Steven Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Production Delivery Services, Inc. d/b/a Production Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Production Delivery Services, Inc.
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?