Bell v. Ward County Sheriffs Office, et al.
Plaintiff: Timothy James Bell
Defendant: John Doe, Ward County Sheriffs Department, Mario LNU, Will LNU, Tiffany LNU, Ward County Jail, Mike Strickland and Emily Lopez
Case Number: 4:2019cv00018
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that Plaintiff must clarify exactly who the Defendants he is suing are no later than August 9, 2019, including a start date for any claims he alleges, or his case may be dismissed for want of prosecution.. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE from Plaintiff to #6 Order for More Definite Statement by Timothy James Bell. (ab1)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT respond no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 400006446 (ab1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ward County Sheriffs Department, Ward County Jail, Mike Strickland, Will, Emily Lopez, Mario, Tiffany amending #1 Complaint., filed by John Doe.(ab1)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ordered that Plaintiff shall either file an Application to Proceed InForma Pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee within twenty (20) days of the entry of this Order or this case shall be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the orders of this Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b).. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must file his complaint on the properpaperwork in order to proceed on this claim. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee Due), filed by Timothy James Bell.(ab1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Ward County Sheriffs Office, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy James Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?