Redmon et al v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Bail Bondsman for Christ, Holy Spirit Oilfield Church, Gerald K. Fugit, Jackie Redmon and Holy Spirit Oilfield Ministry of Kermit, Texas
Defendant: County Sheriff Darin K. Mitchell, Darin K. Mitchell, Winkler County Appraisal Board and Winkler County, Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv00040
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. Judge David Counts no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to County Sheriff of Winkler County, Darin K. Mitchell; Winkler County Appraisal Board and Winkler County, Texas. (ab1)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER for MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jackie Redmon.. Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Fugit, Gerald) Modified on 7/29/2019 (ab1).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jackie Redmon. (Fugit, Gerald)
July 26, 2019 EX PARTE ORAL MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order contained within compliant #1 by Bail Bondsman for Christ, Holy Spirit Oilfield Ministry of Kermit, Texas, Jackie Redmon.. Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1) Modified on 7/30/2019 (mt). Modified on 7/30/2019 (mt).
July 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12400215). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jackie Redmon, Winkler county, texas, Winkler County Appraisal Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Account Summary #1, #3 Exhibit June 11, 2019 Fellowship #2, #4 Exhibit November 19, 2014 #3, #5 Exhibit Full Gospel Fellowship #4, #6 Exhibit Certificate #5, #7 Exhibit Bail bondsman Code #6, #8 Exhibit Appraisal Info #7, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Jackie Redmon #8)(Fugit, Gerald) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/26/2019) (ab1). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/29/2019) (ab1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmon et al v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bail Bondsman for Christ
Represented By: Gerald K. Fugit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holy Spirit Oilfield Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald K. Fugit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Redmon
Represented By: Gerald K. Fugit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holy Spirit Oilfield Ministry of Kermit, Texas
Represented By: Gerald K. Fugit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Sheriff Darin K. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin K. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winkler County Appraisal Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winkler County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?