City of San Antonio, Texas v. Hotels.Com, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of San Antonio, Texas
Defendant: Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc. doing business as Cheaptickets.com, Cendant Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc., Cendant Corporation, IAC/Interactive Corp., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp doing business as Lodging.Com, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC and Travelnow.Com, Inc.
Petitioner: Texas Municipal League, Interactive Travel Services Association, Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Hilton Worldwide and LQ Management L.L.C.
Case Number: 5:2006cv00381
Filed: May 8, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2008 Filing 380 SEALED Motion for leave to Plaintiffs' Rule 72(a) Objections to Magistrate Judge's 11/21/08, Order Under Seal (rg1, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER GRANTING #359 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate Jduge's Order to 12/17/08 and response to 1/9/09. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
December 17, 2008 Filing 378 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiffs' Rule 72(a) Objections to Magistrate Judge's November 21, 2008 Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER GRANTING #370 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File their Motion to Preserve Confidential Information in Deposition Transcripts of Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp., Orbitz, LLC, Site59.com LLC, Travelocity.com Inc., Travelocity.com LP under SEAL. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER GRANTING #369 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER GRANTING #368 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion to Preserve Confidential Information in Deposition Transcripts of Expedia, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., Travelnow.com, INc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotels.com GP, LLC under SEAL. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER GRANTING #367 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Preserve Confidential Information in Deposition Transcripts of Priceline.com Inc., Lowestfare.com Inc., and Travel Web LLC under Seal Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 12, 2008 Filing 373 * Sealed Motion to Preserve Confidential Information Deposition Transcripts of Defendants Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Site59.com, LLC, Travelocity.com Inc., Travelocity.com LP. (rg1, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
December 12, 2008 Filing 372 * Sealed Motion to Preserve Deposition Transcripts filed by Expedia,Inc., Hotwire, Inc., Travelnow.com, Inc., Hotels.com LP, and Hotels.com GP, LLC. (rg1, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
December 12, 2008 Filing 371 * SEALED Motion to Preserve Confidential Information In Deposition Transcripts of Defendants Priceline.com Inc., Lowestfare.com Inc., and Travelweb LLC. (rg1, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
December 12, 2008 Filing 370 * MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL Motion to Preserve Confidential Information in Deposition Transcripts by Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc.. (Kiehne, Mark)
December 12, 2008 Filing 369 *Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
December 12, 2008 Filing 368 * MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL Motion to Preserve Confidential Information in Deposition Transcripts by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
December 12, 2008 Filing 367 * MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL Motion to Preserve Confidential Information in Deposition Transcripts by Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
December 12, 2008 Filing 366 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #343 * MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott W Anderson filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Cruciani, Gary)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER GRANTING #344 Motion for leave to obtain limited discovery from ten absent class members Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 8, 2008 Filing 364 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #344 * MOTION FOR LEAVE TO OBTAIN LIMITED DISCOVERY FROM TEN CLASS MEMBERS filed by Defendant Orbitz, Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, LP, Defendant Travelweb, LLC, Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Priceline.Com., Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Defendant Site59.Com, LLC, Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Trip Network, Inc., Defendant Orbitz, LLC, Defendant Internetwork Publishing Corp (Kiehne, Mark)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
December 8, 2008 Filing 361 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Fritz on behalf of City of San Antonio, Texas (Fritz, Michael)
December 5, 2008 Filing 360 * MOTION to Quash Defendants' Subpoena by Texas Municipal League. (rg1, )
December 2, 2008 Filing 359 *Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #350 Sealed Order and Defendants' Deadline to Respond by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
December 2, 2008 Filing 358 Sealed Document filed by Plaintiffs (rg1, )
December 2, 2008 Filing 357 * MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Response to Expedia's Motion to Redact One Phrase in 11/21/08 Sealed Order Under Seal by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING #355 Motion for Extension of Time to move to preserve the confidentiality of certain deposition transcripts to until 12/12/08. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
December 2, 2008 Filing 355 *Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTIONS PRESERVING THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
December 1, 2008 Filing 354 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #343 * MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott W Anderson filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Kiehne, Mark)
November 26, 2008 Filing 352 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #344 * MOTION FOR LEAVE TO OBTAIN LIMITED DISCOVERY FROM TEN CLASS MEMBERS filed by Defendant Orbitz, Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, LP, Defendant Travelweb, LLC, Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Priceline.Com., Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Defendant Site59.Com, LLC, Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Trip Network, Inc., Defendant Orbitz, LLC, Defendant Internetwork Publishing Corp (Cruciani, Gary)
November 26, 2008 Filing 351 * MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Motion to Redact One Phrase in November 21, 2008, Sealed Order Under Seal with proposed Order by Expedia, Inc.. (Kiehne, Mark)
November 25, 2008 Filing 353 * SEALED motion to Redact One Phrase in 11/21/08, Sealed Order of Defendants Expedia, Inc. filed (rg1) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (ac, )
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER GRANTING #341 Motion to Stay Defendants' Obligation to Move to Preserve the Confidentiality of Deposition Transcripts to until 14 days after receipt of a ruling by Judge Mathy on the requests to modify the protective order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING #346 Motion to Seal Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Defendants'Obligation to Move to Preserve the Confidentiality of Deposition Transcripts. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 19, 2008 Filing 347 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio (Attachments: #1 exhibits- part 1, #2 exhibits-part 2) (rg1, )
November 19, 2008 Filing 346 * MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Response to motion to stay... by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
November 19, 2008 Filing 345 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC Regarding Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Defendants' Obligation to Move to Preserve the Confidentiality of Deposition Transcripts. (Kiehne, Mark)
November 17, 2008 Filing 344 * MOTION FOR LEAVE TO OBTAIN LIMITED DISCOVERY FROM TEN CLASS MEMBERS by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Strieber, Leslie)
November 14, 2008 Filing 343 * MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott W Anderson by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cruciani, Gary)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 342 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #341 * MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' OBLIGATION TO MOVE TO PRESERVE THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS filed by Orbitz, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelocity.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Hotwire, Inc., Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Hotels.Com, L.P., Expedia, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Internetwork Publishing Corp, #312 *Supplemental MOTION to supplement re #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., #324 * MOTION to Expedite Modify Protective Order filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, #277 * Sealed Motion filed filed by Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., 258 * MOTION for Discovery (Preserve Classified Information) filed by Expedia, Inc.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
November 12, 2008 Filing 341 * MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' OBLIGATION TO MOVE TO PRESERVE THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Proposed Order)(Strieber, Leslie)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #312 *Supplemental MOTION to supplement re #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, #324 * MOTION to Expedite Modify Protective Order filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, #277 * Sealed Motion filed filed by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, 258 * MOTION for Discovery (Preserve Classified Information) filed by Expedia, Inc.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Pamela A. Mathy. (rg1, )
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER GRANTING #327 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Expedia Group's Declarations. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING #334 Motion for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER GRANTING #335 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
October 31, 2008 Filing 336 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #324 * MOTION to Expedite Modify Protective Order filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Cruciani, Gary)
October 31, 2008 Filing 335 * MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 27, 2008 Filing 334 *Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 20, 2008 Filing 333 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #324 * MOTION to Expedite Modify Protective Order filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(Kiehne, Mark)
October 20, 2008 Filing 332 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #312 *Supplemental MOTION to supplement re #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kiehne, Mark)
October 14, 2008 Filing 330 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #309 * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Orbitz, Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, LP, Defendant Travelweb, LLC, Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Priceline.Com., Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Defendant Site59.Com, LLC, Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Trip Network, Inc., Defendant Orbitz, LLC, Defendant Internetwork Publishing Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strieber, Leslie)
October 9, 2008 Filing 329 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #327 * MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Expedia Group's Declarations filed by Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 9, 2008 Filing 328 RESPONSE SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO THE EXPEDIA GROUP'S DECLARATIONS to #277 * Sealed Motion filed, #315 Sealed Document, #317 Sealed Document, #327 * MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Expedia Group's Declarations by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
October 9, 2008 Filing 327 * MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Expedia Group's Declarations by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER GRANTING #325 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
October 7, 2008 Filing 325 *Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Response to Motion for Protective Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 6, 2008 Filing 324 * MOTION to Expedite Modify Protective Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order Modified Protective Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 6, 2008 Filing 323 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #275 * MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC For Protective Order Regarding John Allan's Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 6, 2008 Filing 322 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #277 * Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC In Support of Objections to the Expedia Group's Declarations (Cruciani, Gary)
September 30, 2008 Filing 321 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #309 * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Orbitz, Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, LP, Defendant Travelweb, LLC, Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Priceline.Com., Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Defendant Site59.Com, LLC, Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Trip Network, Inc., Defendant Orbitz, LLC, Defendant Internetwork Publishing Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cruciani, Gary)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER GRANTING #316 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER GRANTING #314 Motion to Seal Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER GRANTING #313 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
September 22, 2008 Filing 317 Sealed Document filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (ep, )
September 22, 2008 Filing 316 * MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Objections Under Seal by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (ep, )
September 22, 2008 Filing 315 Sealed Document filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (ep, )
September 22, 2008 Filing 314 * MOTION to File Reply In Support of Motion to Preseve Classified Information Under Seal by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (ep, )
September 22, 2008 Filing 313 * MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (ep, )
September 22, 2008 Filing 312 *Supplemental MOTION to supplement re #275 * MOTION for Protective Order by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kiehne, Mark)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #309 Emergency Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Counsel from Using Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
September 16, 2008 Filing 310 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #309 * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Orbitz, Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, LP, Defendant Travelweb, LLC, Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Priceline.Com., Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Defendant Site59.Com, LLC, Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Trip Network, Inc., Defendant Orbitz, LLC, Defendant Internetwork Publishing Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cruciani, Gary)
September 16, 2008 Filing 309 * MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM USING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN OTHER PROCEEDINGS by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
September 16, 2008 Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Cruciani on behalf of City of San Antonio, Texas of McKool Smith, PC (Cruciani, Gary)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER GRANTING #303 Motion for Leave to File Objections under seal. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER GRANTING #301 Motion for Leave to File Response under seal. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
September 12, 2008 Filing 305 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Strieber, Leslie)
September 10, 2008 Filing 304 Sealed Document filed (ep, )
September 10, 2008 Filing 303 * MOTION for Leave to File Objections by City of San Antonio, Texas. (ep, )
September 10, 2008 Filing 302 Sealed Document filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits continued) (ep, )
September 10, 2008 Filing 301 * MOTION for Leave to File Response by City of San Antonio, Texas. (ep, )
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER GRANTING #297 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lazar Pol Raynal Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
September 8, 2008 Filing 299 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Lazar Pol Raynal; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 214388. (pjr, )
September 8, 2008 Filing 298 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC (Kiehne, Mark)
September 8, 2008 Filing 297 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lazar Pol Raynal by on behalf of Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (ep, )
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER GRANTING #295 Motion for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 295 *Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
August 27, 2008 Filing 294 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Priceline.Com., Inc.. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 293 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Expedia, Inc.. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 292 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Internetwork Publishing Corp. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 291 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Orbitz, Inc.. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 290 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Orbitz, LLC. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 289 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Trip Network, Inc.. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 288 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Hotwire, Inc.. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 287 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 286 RESPONSE AND ANSWER to #273 Supplement to First Amended Complaint by Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP. (ep, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 285 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Joshua G. Herman; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 214188. (kh2)
August 27, 2008 Filing 284 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Jeffrey A. Rossman; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 214187. (kh2) Modified on 8/28/2008 (kh2).
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING #279 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A. Rossman Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING #278 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua G. Herman Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 279 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie J. Strieber, III FOR JEFFREY A. ROSSMAN by on behalf of Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (Strieber, Leslie)
August 26, 2008 Filing 278 * MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie J. Strieber, III FOR JOSHUA G. HERMAN by on behalf of Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (Strieber, Leslie)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER GRANTING #270 Motion to Take More Than 10 Depositions Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING #276 Motion Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
August 21, 2008 Filing 277 * SEALED Motion to Preserve Classified Information of Defendants' Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Hotwire, Inc., and Travelnow.Com, Inc. filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H-J, #3 Exhibit K-L, #4 Exhibit M-P, #5 Exhibit P-Q, #6 Exhibit R-T, #7 Exhibit U) (ep, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
August 21, 2008 Filing 276 * MOTION for Leave to File by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (ep, )
August 21, 2008 Filing 275 * MOTION for Protective Order by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
August 15, 2008 Filing 274 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #270 * MOTION for Leave to Take More than 10 Depositions filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Strieber, Leslie)
August 13, 2008 Filing 273 SUPPLEMENT to #74 Amended Complaint, by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Cruciani, Gary)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER GRANTING #262 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
August 5, 2008 Filing 271 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by City of San Antonio, Texas regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Complaint. (Cruciani, Gary)
August 1, 2008 Filing 270 * MOTION for Leave to Take More than 10 Depositions by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 1D, #5 SEALED Exhibit #6 Exhibit 2B, #7 Exhibit 2C, #8 Exhibit 2D, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10A, #17 Exhibit 1OB, #18 Exhibit 10C, #19 Exhibit 11A, #20 Exhibit 11B, #21 Exhibit 11C, #22 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary) Modified on 8/7/2008 (tm).
July 31, 2008 Filing 269 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Cruciani, Gary)
July 24, 2008 Filing 268 RESPONSE Reply in Support of Objections to New Evidence Attached by Expedia to its Reply Brief to #267 Response by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Cruciani, Gary)
July 24, 2008 Filing 267 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Strike So-Called "New Evidence" Attached by Expedia to its Reply Brief to #264 Sealed Document, #266 Miscellaneous Objection by Expedia, Inc.. (Kiehne, Mark)
July 23, 2008 Filing 266 Miscellaneous Objection to #264 Sealed Document New Evidence Attached by Expedia to its Reply Brief by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Cruciani, Gary)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING #263 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
July 21, 2008 Filing 264 Sealed Document filed (Defendants' Reply in Support of 258 Expedia's motion to Preserve Classified Information) (rg1, )
July 21, 2008 Filing 263 * MOTION to Seal Reply to motion to preserve information by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
July 17, 2008 Filing 262 * MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to First Amended Complaint by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER GRANTING #259 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal its Response to Expedia's Motion to Preserve Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
July 15, 2008 Filing 260 Sealed Document filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (rg1, )
July 15, 2008 Filing 259 * MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Response to Expedia's Motion to Preserve Confidential Information by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Selection set for 6/15/2009 09:30AM before Judge Orlando L. Garcia., Jury Trial set for 6/15/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Orlando L. Garcia., Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2008., Discovery due by 3/13/2009., Motions due by 3/30/2009.), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
June 16, 2008 Filing 256 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Trip Network, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #252 * MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kiehne, Mark)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER GRANTING #254 Motion for entry of order regarding form of class notice Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
June 10, 2008 Filing 254 *Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Form of Class Notice by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER UNSEALING #248 Memorandum and Opinion,. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (ep, )
June 9, 2008 Filing 252 * MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
June 5, 2008 Filing 251 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #45 MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, granting #88 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #240 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Manupintour Holding, LLC. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion to Certify Class; GRANTING #88 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf) (ep, ). Modified on 6/10/2008 to unseal order per order of 6/9/08(ep, ). Modified on 6/11/2008 to correct access restriction (rg1, ).
May 23, 2008 Filing 247 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 5/17/2007, Proceedings Transcribed: Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class and Defendant's Motion to Dimiss. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurice West. (transcript not available electronically)(rg) (rf).
May 23, 2008 Filing 246 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 5/16/2007, Volume 1 of 2 - Proceedings Transcribed: Plaintiff's motion to certify class and Defendant's Motion to Dimiss. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurice West. (transcript not available electronically)(rg) (rf).
April 25, 2008 Filing 245 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven D. Wolens)(Cruciani, Gary)
April 21, 2008 Filing 244 RESPONSE to #243 Advisory to the Court, by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Cruciani, Gary)
April 1, 2008 Filing 243 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strieber, Leslie)
March 20, 2008 Filing 242 RESPONSE to #241 Advisory to the Court, by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Cruciani, Gary)
March 18, 2008 Filing 241 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strieber, Leslie)
March 3, 2008 Filing 240 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Manupintour Holding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
February 22, 2008 Case Stayed (rg1, )
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying #236 Motion to Stay and for entry of scheduling order Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 18, 2008 Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #236 MOTION to Stay Lift filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Cruciani, Gary)
February 6, 2008 Filing 237 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC, re #236 MOTION to Stay Lift filed by Plaintiff City of San Antonio, Texas (Strieber, Leslie)
January 23, 2008 Filing 236 MOTION to Stay Lift by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and for Entry of Scheduling Order, #3 Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Cruciani, Gary)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #233 Motion to Seal Revised Exhibit List Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #231 Motion for leave to file notice of plaintiff's revised class certification hearing exhibit list under Seal Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
October 15, 2007 Filing 233 MOTION to Seal Revised Exhibit List (Exhibit List placed under seal) by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
October 15, 2007 Filing 232 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf)
October 15, 2007 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Plaintiff's Revised Class Certification Hearing Exhibits List Under Seal by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER denying #224 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER this case is STAYED, pending the Court's determination on class certification. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER instructing the parties to revise their exhibit list. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
September 24, 2007 Filing 227 SUPPLEMENT to #225 Supplement,, NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kiehne, Mark)
September 18, 2007 Filing 226 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, re #224 MOTION for Reconsideration re #166 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re #166 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Orbitz, Inc., Defendant Travelnow.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotels.Com GP, LLC, Defendant Site59.Com, LLC, Defendant Hotels.Com, L.P., Defendant Internetwork Publishing Corp, Defendant Cheap Tickets, Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, LP, Defendant Travelweb, LLC, Defendant Priceline.Com., Inc., Defendant Travelocity.Com, Inc., Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Defendant Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Defendant Manupintour Holding, LLC, Defendant Expedia, Inc., Defendant Orbitz, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L)(Cruciani, Gary)
September 10, 2007 Filing 225 SUPPLEMENT to 163 Sealed Document, 220 Sealed Document, AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strieber, Leslie)
September 7, 2007 Filing 224 MOTION for Reconsideration re #166 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cedillo, Ricardo)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #216 Motion to file Plaintiff's Response to Rebuttal of Supllement Expert Report Under Seal. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #219 Motion to File Post-Hearing Brief Under Seal. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
July 13, 2007 Filing 220 Sealed Document filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rf)
July 13, 2007 Filing 219 MOTION for Leave to file Post-Hearing Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification Under Seal by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rf, )
July 13, 2007 Filing 218 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf)
July 13, 2007 Filing 217 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Appendix to Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification of Typicality...) (rg1, )
July 10, 2007 Filing 223 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Response to Rebuttal of Supplement to the Expert Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, PH.D. Sealed Document permitted as per order filed 7/17/07 dkt entry no. 222.) (rg1, )
July 10, 2007 Filing 216 MOTION to Seal Response to Rebuttal of Supplement to Expert Report by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
July 10, 2007 Notice of Correction: ***EDITED CASE PARTICIPANTS TO REFLECT CORRECT FILERS as defendants (originally entered plaintiff as filer.)*** re 215 Sealed Document. (rg) Modified on 7/11/2007 (rg1, ).
July 3, 2007 Filing 215 Sealed Document filed by Hotels.com, L.P., Hotels.com, GP, LLC; Hotwire, Inc.; Trip Network, Inc. Expedia, Inc.; Internetwork Publishing Corp. Lowest Fare.com, Inc.; Maupintour Holding, LLC; Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC; priceline.com, Inc., Site59.com, LLC; Travelocity.com, Inc., Travelocity.com, LP; Travelweb, LLC; and TravelNow.com, Inc. (rg) Modified on 7/10/2007 (rg, ). Modified on 7/10/2007 to add filers (rg).
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Motion for Leave to File supplemental expert rebuttal report under seal. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
June 29, 2007 Filing 213 MOTION for Leave to File supplemental expert rebuttal report under seal by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Seal plaintiff's supplemental expert report Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #199 Motion to Seal defendants' and plaintiff's highlighted deposition transcripts Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Seal defendants' and plaintiff's DVD clips. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
June 21, 2007 Filing 209 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Expert Report (Supplement placed under SEAL) by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER denying #205 Motion to Expedite Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
June 18, 2007 Filing 206 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Class Certification Briefs with Order attached by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Kiehne, Mark)
June 15, 2007 Filing 205 MOTION to Expedite (Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Class Certification Briefs) by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Expedited Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Class Certification Briefs)(Kiehne, Mark)
June 8, 2007 Filing 204 **DUPLICATE ENTRY - same as dkt entry no. 203** Plaintiff's and Defendants' Exhibit List with Objections by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., City of San Antonio, Texas, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 #2)(rg1, ) Modified on 6/8/2007 to reflect duplicate entry (rg1, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 203 Plaintiff's and Defendants' Exhibit List with Objections by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., City of San Antonio, Texas, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 #2)(rg1, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 202 Plaintiff's and Defendants' DVD Clip List by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., City of San Antonio, Texas, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 #2) (Only one DVD was provided. The SEALED DVD has been made part of this document and has been forwarded to the District Court for review.)(rg1, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' and Plaintiff's DVD Clips under Seal by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Only one DVD was provided. The SEALED DVD has been made part of Plaintiff's and Defendants' DVD Clip List dkt entry no. 202 and has been forwarded to the District Court for review) (rg1, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 200 Plaintiff's and Defendants' Designations, Objections, Optional Completeness and Counter Designations by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5) (Only one set of notebooks volumes 1 & 2 provided. SEALED notebooks have been forwarded to the District Court. )(rg1, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 199 MOTION for leave to file Defendants' and Plaitiff's Highlighted Deposition Transcripts Under Seal by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Only one set consisting of 2 notebooks was provided. SEALED Notebooks Volumes 1 & 2 have been made part of document entry no. 200 and have been forwarded to the District Court for review.) (rg1, ) Modified on 6/8/2007 (rg1, ).
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #193 Motion to Seal Plaitniff's Brief and Exhibit C Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER. Parties are to file deposition excerpts and objections by 6/8/07.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 196 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orlando L. Garcia : Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Class Certification held on 5/17/2007 re #88 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas,, #45 MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. No exhibits admitted at this time. The parties will submit a DVD of video depositions, briefs, list of exhibits. All exhibits present for the courts consideration will be sealed pursuant to the protective order. (3 boxes of plaintiff's exhibits, 2 boxes of defendants exhibits were tendered to the Courts briefing attorney for future review) (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Maurice West.) (rg1, )
May 16, 2007 Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orlando L. Garcia : Evidentiary hearing on Motion for class certification held on 5/16/2007 re #88 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas,, #45 MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Maurice West.) (rg1, )
May 16, 2007 Filing 194 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
May 16, 2007 Filing 193 SEALED Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response Under Seal. (rg1, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
May 16, 2007 Filing 192 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura E. Gutierrez Tamez on behalf of City of San Antonio, Texas Frank Herrera, Jr. (Tamez, Laura)
May 15, 2007 Filing 190 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #88 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class [Second Supplement] by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wolens Declaration#2 Exhibit Cruciani Declaration#3 Exhibit Reid Declaration)(Cruciani, Gary)
May 15, 2007 Filing 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Cruciani on behalf of City of San Antonio, Texas Diamond McCarthy as Counsel of Record (Cruciani, Gary)
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying #185 Motion in Limine regarding disclosure of confidential information at the class certification hearing Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 188 Response in Opposition to Motion re #185 MOTION in Limine Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Information at Class Certification Hearing, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green v. Crombie#2 Exhibit B - ALL22#3 Exhibit C - Gordon Depo.)(Cruciani, Gary)
May 11, 2007 Filing 187 SUPPLEMENT to #185 MOTION in Limine Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Information at Class Certification Hearing by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N)(Strieber, Leslie)
May 10, 2007 Filing 186 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1#2 Exhibit A-2#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D)(Strieber, Leslie)
May 9, 2007 Filing 185 MOTION in Limine Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Information at Class Certification Hearing by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit #10 Exhibit #11 Exhibit #12 Exhibit #13 Exhibit #14 Exhibit)(Strieber, Leslie)
April 3, 2007 Filing 184 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Manupintour Holding, LLC.(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 183 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Priceline.Com., Inc..(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 182 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Orbitz, Inc..(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 181 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Orbitz, LLC.(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 180 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Internetwork Publishing Corp.(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 179 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Trip Network, Inc. dba Cheaptickets.com incorrectly named as Cheap Tickets, Inc.(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 178 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC.(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 177 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Expedia, Inc..(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 176 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Hotwire, Inc..(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 175 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Travelocity.Com, LP.(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 174 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Travelocity.Com, Inc..(rg1, )
April 3, 2007 Filing 173 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Site59.Com, LLC.(rg1, )
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for #88 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class, #45 MOTION to Certify Class Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2007 09:30 AM before Honorable Orlando L. Garcia.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER STAYING #45 MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas and cancelling the hearing scheduled for 3/27/07. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (tm)
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Cancelling Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #165 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages relating to Defendants' Sealed Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER. The letters addressed in this order should be produced within 5 days from the date of this order.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying #26 defendants' Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 20, 2007 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in the filing of Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
March 20, 2007 Filing 164 Sealed Document (Appendix in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification) filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
March 20, 2007 Filing 163 Sealed Document (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification and Appendix) filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
March 20, 2007 Filing 162 MOTION for leave to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
March 16, 2007 Filing 161 NOTICE Notice of Additional Authority in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by City of San Antonio, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cruciani, Gary)
March 16, 2007 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/2/06. Proceedings Transcribed:Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Court Reporter: West. NOTE: Transcript document is not available online. (tm) (rf).
March 15, 2007 Filing 159 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: **NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT A CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED** re #158 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (rf)
March 15, 2007 Filing 158 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC AMENDED. (Strieber, Leslie) Modified on 3/15/2007, to modify text document is sufficient (rf)
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 153 Sealed Motion Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 151 Sealed Motion Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 15, 2007 Notice of Correction: **NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO DISREGARD #159 Deficiency Notice AS IT WAS ISSUED IN ERROR #158 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7), Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) IS CONSIDERED SUFFICIENT**. (rf)
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #131 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 14, 2007 Filing 154 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf)
March 14, 2007 Filing 153 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
March 14, 2007 Filing 152 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf)
March 14, 2007 Filing 151 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Exceed 10-Page Limit by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Compel Production of Transaction Data Under Seal. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 14, 2007 Notice of Correction: **NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT A SEPARATE ENTRY WAS MADE TO ADDRESS THE RELIEF INCORPORATED IN THE RESPONSE AND TO ADVISE THAT SEPARATE ENTRIES ARE REQUIRED FOR SUCH AN EVENT** re #148 MOTION to Compel, #148 Response to Motion. (rf)
March 13, 2007 Filing 148 Expedited MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendants by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2007 (rf).
March 13, 2007 Filing 148 RESPONSE to Motion re #131 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with Court's February 16 Order, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit 12#13 Exhibit 13#14 Exhibit 14#15 Exhibit 15#16 Exhibit 16#17 Exhibit 17#18 Exhibit 18#19 Exhibit 19#20 Proposed Order)(Goodrich, Frank)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #140 Motion to Seal Response dkt entry no. 141. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Seal Opposition dkt entry no. 137. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Seal Response dkt entry no. 139. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Seal expedited motion to compel transaction data (dkt entry no. 128) Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 13, 2007 Filing 143 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
March 13, 2007 Filing 142 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Compel Transaction Data by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 141 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION to compel production of transactional data, filed by Hotwire, Inc.. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 140 MOTION to Seal Response to plaintiff's expedited motion to compel the Production of transaction data by Hotwire, Inc.. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 139 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION to compel production of transaction data, filed by Cheap Tickets, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, LLC. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 138 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel Production of Transaction Data by Cheap Tickets, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, LLC. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 137 SEALED Response in Opposition to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION to compel the production of transaction data, filed by Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 136 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel the Production of Transaction Data by Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (rg1, )
March 8, 2007 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Transaction Data, filed by Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP. (Strieber, Leslie)
March 8, 2007 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Transaction Data, filed by Manupintour Holding, LLC. (Strieber, Leslie)
March 8, 2007 Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Transaction Data, filed by Expedia, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Strieber, Leslie)
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Expedite motion to compel production of transaction data Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 7, 2007 Filing 131 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with Court's February 16 Order by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Proposed Order)(Strieber, Leslie)
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. Plaintiff's supplemental class certification briefing due 3/13/07, defendant's response to briefing due 3/20/07. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/27/2007 09:00 AM before Honorable Orlando L. Garcia.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
March 6, 2007 Filing 129 MOTION to Expedite by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodrich, Frank)
March 6, 2007 Filing 128 SEALED Expedited Motion to Compel Production of Transaction Data (rg1, ) Modified on 3/10/2009, to edit text (rf).
March 6, 2007 Filing 127 MOTION to Seal motion to compel transaction data by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #123 Motion to Seal Response filed as dkt entry no. 124. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 124 Sealed Document filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, ) (rf).
February 26, 2007 Filing 123 MOTION to Seal Response to Defendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order and Defendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Expert Data. by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
February 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #119 Motion to Compel Expert data. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Compel plaintiff's compliance with the Court Order. Plaintiff shall produce documents on 2/26/07. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 22, 2007 Filing 120 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with the Court's Order by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
February 22, 2007 Filing 119 MOTION to Compel Expert Data by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re #117 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #108 Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 14, 2007 Filing 116 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Celso M. Gonzalez-Falla; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 205224. (ep, )
February 13, 2007 Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion re #108 MOTION to Compel, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolens, Steven)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting #110 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting #112 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
February 7, 2007 Filing 113 NOTICE of Additional Authority that May be Referenced at Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by City of San Antonio, Texas (Cruciani, Gary)
February 7, 2007 Filing 112 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. Kiehne for Celso Gonzalez-Falla by on behalf of Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiehne, Mark)
February 5, 2007 Filing 111 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Michael A. Barlow, Karen L. Valihura; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 205066. (pjr, )
February 5, 2007 Filing 110 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Barlow by on behalf of Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (rg1, )
February 5, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen L. Valihura by on behalf of Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (rg1, )
February 5, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION to Compel by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R#19 Exhibit S#20 Exhibit T#21 Exhibit U#22 Exhibit V#23 Exhibit W#24 Exhibit X#25 Proposed Order)(Strieber, Leslie)
January 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Discovery on class certification due by 3/2/2007. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
January 19, 2007 Filing 106 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order order)(Cruciani, Gary)
January 3, 2007 Filing 105 Letter/Correspondence in response to plaintiff's faxed letter from Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re #103 Order which was not docketed or sent to counsel as signed on 12/12/06. Deadlines are extended to until 1/12/07.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re #90 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with the Court's November 3, 2006 Order filed by City of San Antonio, Texas, . Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #90 Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
December 18, 2006 Filing 101 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rf)
December 12, 2006 Filing 98 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cheap Tickets, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC (Amended). (Patel, Purvi)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg, )
December 7, 2006 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with the Court's November 3, 2006 Order , filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, ) Modified on 12/14/2006 File dated edited. Doc. deemed filed on 12/7/06 per order document #99(mj, ).
December 7, 2006 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation with regard to Reply Brief by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Proposed Order)(Wolens, Steven)
December 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER mooting #94 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to Response to Plaintiff's motion to Compel Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
December 1, 2006 Filing 95 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with the Court's November 3, 2006 Order , filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
December 1, 2006 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Cendant Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc., Cendant Corporation, IAC/Interactive Corp., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit)(Cedillo, Ricardo)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Compel Defendants to Comply with Court Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 22, 2006 Filing 92 APPENDIX to #90 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with the Court's November 3, 2006 Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-N#2 Exhibit O-V)(Rich, Alan)
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Defendants shall file their response to Motion #90 on or before 12/1/06 at 12:00 noon. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
November 22, 2006 Filing 90 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with the Court's November 3, 2006 Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Rich, Alan)
November 22, 2006 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Re: Expedited Motion to Compel Defendants to Comply with the Court's November 3, 2006 Order by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Rich, Alan)
November 6, 2006 Filing 88 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolens, Steven)
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER allowing defendant to amend motion to dismiss by 11/17/06.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Discovery due by 2/16/2007. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/19/2007 09:30 AM before Honorable Orlando L. Garcia.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 2, 2006 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orlando L. Garcia : Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2006 re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hotels.Com, L.P. et al. Motion taken under advisement #45 MOTION to Certify Class filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. Motion was not heard. Defendants anounce not ready. Hearing on motion to certify class will be reset. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Maurice West.) (rg1, )
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting #72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Paul E. Chronis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Darrel J. Hieber to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
October 31, 2006 Filing 81 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Paul E. Chronis; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203671. (ga)
October 31, 2006 Filing 80 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Darrel J. Hieber; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203670. (ga)
October 31, 2006 Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul E. Chronis by on behalf of Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
October 31, 2006 Filing 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darrel J. Hieber by on behalf of Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (rg1, )
October 31, 2006 Filing 77 ADVISORY TO THE COURT announcing "not ready" for 11/2/06 hearing. by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting #68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
October 31, 2006 Filing 74 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC amending #1 Complaint., filed by City of San Antonio, Texas.(rg1, )
October 30, 2006 Filing 75 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by James Oliva; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203627. (ga)
October 30, 2006 Filing 73 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by David F. McDowell; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203628. (ga)
October 30, 2006 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Oliva by on behalf of Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP. (rg1, )
October 30, 2006 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David F. McDowell by on behalf of Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP. (rg1, )
October 30, 2006 Filing 66 DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: re 65 Notice of Filing of First Amended Complaint. ** FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed traditionally. Access to this E-Filed document has been restricted.** (rg1, )
October 27, 2006 Filing 70 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Purvi G. Patel; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203608. (ga)
October 27, 2006 Filing 69 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Elizabeth B. Herrington; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203609. (ga)
October 27, 2006 Filing 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Purvi G. Patel by on behalf of Cheap Tickets, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (tm)
October 27, 2006 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth B. Herrington by on behalf of Cheap Tickets, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (tm)
October 26, 2006 Filing 64 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Deborah S. Sloan; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203585. (ga)
October 26, 2006 Filing 63 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by James P. Karen; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 203586. (ga)
October 26, 2006 Filing 62 MOTION for attorney James P. Karen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
October 26, 2006 Filing 61 MOTION for attorney Deborah S. Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for #26 MOTION to Dismiss, #45 MOTION to Certify Class Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2006 09:00 AM before Honorable Orlando L. Garcia.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
September 29, 2006 Filing 59 Response in support of Motion re #45 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Rich, Alan) Modified on 9/29/2006 (rg, )to correct docket text.
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Emergency #57 Motion for Protective Order, granting #57 Motion to Quash plaintiff's unilaterally noticed depositions Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
September 20, 2006 Filing 57 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(rg1, )
September 18, 2006 Filing 56 (REDACTED VERSION) APPENDIX to #55 Response in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments to REDACTED Appendix not available electronically - due to size) UNREDACTED VERSION of Appendix and Attachments placed under SEAL) (rg1, )
September 18, 2006 Filing 55 (REDACTED VERSION) Response in Opposition to Motion re #45 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (UNREDACTED VERSION of Response placed under SEAL) (rg1, )
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have until Monday, September 18th to file response. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mj, )
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
September 8, 2006 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
September 8, 2006 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File reply to plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
September 8, 2006 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #45 MOTION to Certify Class by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (marked RECEIVED) by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
September 5, 2006 Proposed Scheduling Order marked RECEIVED and forwarded to District Court for approval/signature. (rg1, )
August 29, 2006 Filing 46 Request for Scheduling Conference and Proposed Scheduling Order by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
August 29, 2006 Filing 45 MOTION to Certify Class by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Exhibits to document not available electronically-exceeds page limit) (rg1, )
August 22, 2006 Filing 39 Joint Rule 26(F) Report by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., City of San Antonio, Texas, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
August 18, 2006 Filing 44 Summons Returned Unexecuted by City of San Antonio, Texas as to Internetwork Publishing Corp. (Secretary of State received certified mail process bearing the notation "not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward") (rg1, )
August 18, 2006 Filing 43 Summons Returned Unexecuted by City of San Antonio, Texas as to Cheap Tickets, Inc.. (Secretary of State received certified mail process bearing the notation "not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward") (rg1, )
August 18, 2006 Filing 42 Summons Returned Unexecuted by City of San Antonio, Texas as to Travelnow.Com, Inc.. (Secretary of State has not received certified mail receipt for this defendant) (rg1, )
August 18, 2006 Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted by City of San Antonio, Texas as to Orbitz, Inc..(Secretary of State has not received certified mail receipt from defendant)(rg1, )
August 18, 2006 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of San Antonio, Texas. Site59.Com, LLC served on 7/14/2006, answer due 8/3/2006. (Secretary of State certification) (rg1, )
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #29 Motion to extend all deadlines Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
August 17, 2006 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #29 MOTION to extend deadlines, filed by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
August 9, 2006 Filing 36 APPENDIX to #35 Response to Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit)(rg1, )
August 9, 2006 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Dismiss fo failue to state a claim upon which elief may be granted , filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, granting #33 amended Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 33 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Responseto dfts' motion to dismiss by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
August 7, 2006 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 dfts' MOTION to extend deadlines, filed by City of San Antonio, Texas. (rg1, )
August 7, 2006 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Response to dfts' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of San Antonio, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rg1, )
July 31, 2006 Filing 30 Amended RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, )
July 26, 2006 Filing 29 MOTION to Extend All Deadlines Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rf)
July 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to motion to dismiss to until 8/10/06. Defendants shall have 30 days from filing date of response to file a reply. Plaintiff shall have until 8/29/06 to file its motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg1, )
July 10, 2006 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss; and to file motion for Class Certification by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., City of San Antonio, Texas, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rg1, ) Modified on 7/12/2006 (rg1, ).
July 3, 2006 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (voluminous exhibits included in Appendix are not available electronically) (rf)
July 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Ten Pages Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion in Excess of Ten Pages by Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed motion to dismiss)(rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 23 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orbitz, LLC. (rf). Modified pdf and text on 7/12/2006 (tm).
June 30, 2006 Filing 22 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 21 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Internetwork Publishing Corp. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 20 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hotwire, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 19 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orbitz, Inc. (rf) Modified docket text on 7/12/2006 (tm).
June 30, 2006 Filing 18 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Manupintour Holding, LLC. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 17 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Priceline.Com., Inc., Travelweb, LLC. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cheap Tickets, Inc.. (rf)
June 30, 2006 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants Without Prejudice by City of San Antonio, Texas (rf)
June 26, 2006 Notice of Correction: re #11 Summons Returned Executed. Modification made to docket entry no. 11 to reflect that summons was returned UNexecuted, no executed. (rg1, )
June 23, 2006 Filing 14 Summons RE-Issued as to Site59.Com, LLC. (rg1, )
June 8, 2006 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hotwire, Inc. served on 5/15/2006, answer due 6/5/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lowest Fare.Com, Inc. served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned UNExecuted Site59.Com, LLC served on 5/22/2006, answer due 6/12/2006. (tm) Modified on 6/26/2006 (rg1, modification made to text to reflect that summons was unexecuted, no executed).
June 8, 2006 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Priceline.Com., Inc. served on 5/26/2006, answer due 6/15/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cendant Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc. served on 5/15/2006, answer due 6/5/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Internetwork Publishing Corp served on 5/15/2006, answer due 6/5/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Orbitz, LLC served on 5/16/2006, answer due 6/5/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cendant Corporation served on 5/15/2006, answer due 6/5/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Manupintour Holding, LLC served on 5/10/2006, answer due 5/30/2006. (tm)
June 8, 2006 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed IAC/Interactive Corp. served on 5/10/2006, answer due 5/30/2006. (tm)
May 23, 2006 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Internetwork Publishing Corp. (rg1, )
May 8, 2006 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hotwire, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Cendant Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc., Cendant Corporation, IAC/Interactive Corp., Expedia, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp, Lowest Fare.Com, Inc., Manupintour Holding, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com., Inc., Site59.Com, LLC, Travelocity.Com, Inc., Travelocity.Com, LP, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.Com, Inc., Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotels.Com GP, LLC. (pjr, )
May 8, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 201042), filed by City of San Antonio, Texas.(pjr, ) Modified on 5/9/2006 (pjr, )to text in jury demand.
May 8, 2006 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nowak (pjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of San Antonio, Texas v. Hotels.Com, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Antonio, Texas
Represented By: Alan B. Rich
Represented By: Carrie A. King
Represented By: Deborah Lynne Klein
Represented By: Ferdinand F. Fischer, III
Represented By: Frank E. Goodrich
Represented By: Gary Cruciani
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Martha Guadiana Sepeda
Represented By: Michael Debs Bernard
Represented By: Michael P. Fritz
Represented By: Steven D. Wolens
Represented By: Thomas Alden Graves
Represented By: Thomas M. Sims
Represented By: Frank Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Laura E. Gutierrez Tamez
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Connell
Represented By: William T. Reid, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.Com, L.P.
Represented By: Deborah S. Sloan
Represented By: Emmanuel E. Ubinas
Represented By: James Paul Karen
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Paul E. Chronis
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: W. Kelly Stewart
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.Com GP, LLC
Represented By: Deborah S. Sloan
Represented By: James Paul Karen
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Paul E. Chronis
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: W. Kelly Stewart
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotwire, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah S. Sloan
Represented By: James Paul Karen
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Paul E. Chronis
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: W. Kelly Stewart
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trip Network, Inc. doing business as Cheaptickets.com
Represented By: Aron J. Frakes
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Herrington
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rossman
Represented By: Joshua G. Herman
Represented By: Lazar Pol Raynal
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Purvi G. Patel
Represented By: Rachael L. Mamula
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Tedd M. Warden
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cendant Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cendant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/Interactive Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah S. Sloan
Represented By: James Paul Karen
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Paul E. Chronis
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: W. Kelly Stewart
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internetwork Publishing Corp doing business as Lodging.Com
Represented By: Aron J. Frakes
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Herrington
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rossman
Represented By: Joshua G. Herman
Represented By: Lazar Pol Raynal
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Purvi G. Patel
Represented By: Rachael L. Mamula
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Tedd M. Warden
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowest Fare.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Celso M. Gonzalez-Falla
Represented By: Darrel J. Hieber
Represented By: Karen L. Valihura
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Michael A. Barlow
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manupintour Holding, LLC
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz, Inc.
Represented By: Aron J. Frakes
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Herrington
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rossman
Represented By: Joshua G. Herman
Represented By: Lazar Pol Raynal
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Purvi G. Patel
Represented By: Rachael L. Mamula
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Tedd M. Warden
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz, LLC
Represented By: Aron J. Frakes
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Herrington
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rossman
Represented By: Joshua G. Herman
Represented By: Lazar Pol Raynal
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Purvi G. Patel
Represented By: Rachael L. Mamula
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Tedd M. Warden
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priceline.Com., Inc.
Represented By: Celso M. Gonzalez-Falla
Represented By: Darrel J. Hieber
Represented By: Jason D. Russell
Represented By: Karen L. Valihura
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Michael A. Barlow
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Stacy R. Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Site59.Com, LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Stagner
Represented By: David F. McDowell
Represented By: James Oliva
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Stacy S. Russell
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelocity.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Stagner
Represented By: David F. McDowell
Represented By: James Oliva
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Stacy S. Russell
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelocity.Com, LP
Represented By: Brian S. Stagner
Represented By: David F. McDowell
Represented By: James Oliva
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Stacy S. Russell
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelweb, LLC
Represented By: Celso M. Gonzalez-Falla
Represented By: Darrel J. Hieber
Represented By: Jason D. Russell
Represented By: Karen L. Valihura
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Michael A. Barlow
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: Stacy R. Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelnow.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah S. Sloan
Represented By: James Paul Karen
Represented By: Leslie J. Strieber, III
Represented By: Paul E. Chronis
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Represented By: W. Kelly Stewart
Represented By: Mark W. Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Texas Municipal League
Represented By: Clarissa M. Rodriguez
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Provencio
Represented By: Patrick Charles Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Interactive Travel Services Association
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Valle
Represented By: S. Mark Murray
Represented By: Steven M. Ragona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Diane Massey
Represented By: Samuel Vance Houston, III
Represented By: William H. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Diane Massey
Represented By: Samuel Vance Houston, III
Represented By: William H. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hyatt Corporation
Represented By: Lori Diane Massey
Represented By: Samuel Vance Houston, III
Represented By: William H. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hilton Worldwide
Represented By: Lori Diane Massey
Represented By: Samuel Vance Houston, III
Represented By: William H. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LQ Management L.L.C.
Represented By: Amber Taylor Welock
Represented By: Kelly Franklin Bagnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?