Shaw et al v. Hardberger et al
Case Number: 5:2006cv00751
Filed: September 6, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 119 Report and Recommendations. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 125 Motion to Retax Costs Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING 108 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING 94 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 96 Motion for Leave to File; DISMISSING AS MOOT 99 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw et al v. Hardberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?