Villaje Del Rio, Ltd. v. Colina Del Rio LP et al
Plaintiff: Villaje Del Rio, Ltd.
Defendant: Colina Del Rio LP and Deutsche Bank Berkshire Mortgage, Inc.
Third Party Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Berkshire Mortgage, Inc.
Third Party Defendant: George Gels, Gels Construction and Goldbrick, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv00947
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
County: Bexar
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING 86 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ep, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING 94 Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims for Fraudulent Conveyance. DBBM's counterclaims and third-party claims remain pending. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ep, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 90 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ep, )
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Dismiss. Fraudulent cause of action is SEVERED and REFERRED to the Bankruptcy Court of the Western District of Texas (Copy of order mailed to Bankruptcy Court). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ep, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villaje Del Rio, Ltd. v. Colina Del Rio LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Villaje Del Rio, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Curtis Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colina Del Rio LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Berkshire Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Santos Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Berkshire Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Santos Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: George Gels
Represented By: J. Scott Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Gels Construction
Represented By: J. Scott Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Goldbrick, Inc.
Represented By: J. Scott Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?