Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. v. Giraffe Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.
Defendant: Giraffe Logistics, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Ken Spriggs, InView Logistics, LLC, Todd Soerens and Rick Spriggs
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv00143
Filed: February 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Bexar
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2009 Filing 62 Letter/Correspondence regarding "Rejection of Service of Process" as to Giraffe Logistics, LLC and Inview Logistics, LLC. (ga)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING #52 Motion for Default Judgment and DISMISSING the remaining claims without prejudice. There being no other issues for the Court to decide in this matter, the Clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER VACATING 46 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. It is Ordered that Exhibit G to previously-filed Motion doc. #52 is accepted for filing under seal. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
August 14, 2009 Filing 55 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #53 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Caligur, Matthew)
August 13, 2009 Filing 54 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Matthew W. Caligur - Proposed order required with motion. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the Attachment event located under Other Documents from menu and link the proposed order to this document. See page 10, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas. re #53 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (rg)
August 13, 2009 Filing 53 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1) (Caligur, Matthew)
August 13, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION for Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC; InView Logistics, LLC; Richard M. Spriggs by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F-1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F-2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit Exhibit I, #13 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Caligur, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2009: #14 Sealed Exhibit G) (ga, ).
August 5, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. as to Third Party Defendant Ken Spriggs (Caligur, Matthew)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2009. Order (doc. #43) is VACATED. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2009. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
July 24, 2009 Filing 42 Sealed Document filed (ga)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
July 24, 2009 Filing 40 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. against Giraffe Logistics, in the amount of $190,868.44 plus cost of court. Granting Motion #38 for Default Judgment Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC filed by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 23, 2009 Filing 39 Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Caligur, Matthew)
July 23, 2009 Filing 38 Proposed MOTION for Default Judgment Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, R.)
July 22, 2009 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENT to #14 Attachment Second Supplement to Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Griffin, R.)
July 16, 2009 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. Rick Spriggs served on 7/7/2009, answer due 7/27/2009. (Caligur, Matthew)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 Joint Motion to Dismiss without prejudice third-party plaintiff Cardinal Health and third-party defendant Todd Sorens. Terminated party Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. and Todd Soerens. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 14, 2009 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caligur, Matthew)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Soerens is ordered to file a pleading in response to Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Cardinal Health 200, Inc. on or before July 21, 2009. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 30, 2009 Reset Deadlines: Todd Soerens answer due 7/21/2009. (rg)
June 29, 2009 Filing 33 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Todd Soerens, Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gruber, Melodee)
June 15, 2009 Reset Deadlines: Todd Soerens answer due 6/30/2009. (rg)
June 12, 2009 Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Todd Soerens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fogle, Stephen)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Soerens shall file his pleading in response to the third party complaint of Cardinal Health 200, Inc. by June 30, 2009. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 9, 2009 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. Todd Soerens served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/16/2009. (Caligur, Matthew)
June 9, 2009 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. InView Logistics, LLC served on 5/11/2009, answer due 5/31/2009. (Caligur, Matthew)
June 9, 2009 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. Giraffe Logistics, LLC served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (Caligur, Matthew)
June 8, 2009 Reset Deadlines: Todd Soerens answer due 6/16/2009. (rg)
June 8, 2009 Filing 28 PROPOSED Order to Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim by Todd Soerens. (Gruber, Melodee) Modified description of document on 6/9/2009 (rg). Modified text on 6/9/2009 (rg).
June 8, 2009 Filing 27 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim by Todd Soerens. (Gruber, Melodee)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS #3 Motion to Dismiss is DISMISSED; Terminated party Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.; GRANTING #20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Third Party Defendant Todd Soerens to file his answer shall be extended until June 16, 2009. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 5, 2009 Filing 25 Sealed Document filed, (rg)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 2, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE of Joining in Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. (Caligur, Matthew)
June 1, 2009 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. to Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Griffin, R.)
May 29, 2009 Filing 21 Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sealed Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Caligur, Matthew)
May 29, 2009 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc., Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal)(Caligur, Matthew)
May 21, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, R.)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's response to Defendant Cardinal Health's motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before June 1, 2009. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause on or before June 1, 2009 why Giraffe Logistics should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
May 14, 2009 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT re #12 Proposed MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. (Griffin, R.) Modified docket entry on 5/14/2009 (rg).
May 13, 2009 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Giraffe Logistics, LLC. (rf)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Plaintiff must supplement its pleadings and/or record to make a prima facie showing of the Court's personal jurisdiction over Giraffe Logistics, LLC. on or before May 14, 2009. re #12 Proposed MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC filed by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response To Defendant Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.'s motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response on or before Thursday, May 21, 2009. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
April 29, 2009 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT Default Judgment to #12 Proposed MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Griffin, R.)
April 29, 2009 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney R. Gaines Griffin - Proposed order required with motion. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the Attachment event located under Other Documents from menu and link the proposed order to this document. See page 10, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas.re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC. (rg)
April 29, 2009 Filing 12 Proposed MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Giraffe Logistics, LLC by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Griffin, R.)
April 29, 2009 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Griffin, R.)
April 21, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. Giraffe Logistics, LLC served on 3/3/2009, answer due 3/23/2009. (Griffin, R.)
April 21, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc. served on 3/3/2009, answer due 3/23/2009. (Griffin, R.)
April 20, 2009 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Griffin, R.)
April 20, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, R.)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant Cardinal Health's motion to dismiss shall be extended until May 1, 2009. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
April 1, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, R.)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant Cardinal Health's motion to dismiss shall be extended until April 20, 2009. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ts)
March 24, 2009 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against InView Logistics, LLC, Ken Spriggs, Rick Spriggs, Todd Soerens, CROSSCLAIM against Giraffe Logistics, LLC by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.(rg)
March 23, 2009 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Caligur, Matthew)
March 23, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) by Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caligur, Matthew)
February 23, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Giraffe Logistics, LLC, Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.. (ga)
February 23, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 50001386), filed by Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet plus receipt)(ga)
February 23, 2009 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nowak (ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc. v. Giraffe Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ken Spriggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: InView Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Todd Soerens
Represented By: Stephen R. Fogle
Represented By: Melodee L. Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rick Spriggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Caligur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Motor Transport, Inc.
Represented By: R. Gaines Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giraffe Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?