Hernandez v. Swift Transportation Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brandon Hernandez
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv00855
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
County: Bexar
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 45 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING 39 Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Witness Affidavit and Exhibits Attached to the Defendants Response; GRANTING 47 Motion for Leave to Amend the Experts Affidavit; DENYING 29 Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Defendants Expert Witness and Exclude the Experts Testimony Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (tm)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 31 Motion for Leave to Supplement Defendants Designation of Experts and Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (tm)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DISMISSING as moot 27 Motion to Strike Defendant's response. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (tm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Swift Transportation Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hernandez
Represented By: Rodolfo Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?