Target Strike, Inc. v. Marston & Marston, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gold Resources of Nevada, LLC and Target Strike, Inc.
Defendant: Resurrection Canyon, Inc., Mexivada Mining Corporation, Panther Resources Partners, LLLP, Panther Resources, Inc., William J. Hartley, Lou B. Kost, Jr., L.K. & C.A., Inc., Gold Reef International, Inc., Gold Reef of Nevada, Inc., Marston Environmental, Inc., Marston & Marston, Inc., Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd, Richard Crissman Capps, ADDKO, Inc., Brett Chance Addington, Crandell Addington, Sadik Al-Bassam, And Other Unkown Defendants, Resurrection Canyon, LLLP, William Shaffer, Paul Strobel, Texas Research, Limited Liability Company and Clifford R. Williams
Counter Plaintiff: Panther Resources Partners, LLLP, Panther Resources, Inc., Resurrection Canyon, Inc., William J. Hartley, Lou B. Kost, Jr., L.K. & C.A., Inc., Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd, ADDKO, Inc., Crandell Addington, Sadik Al-Bassam, Richard Crissman Capps, Resurrection Canyon, LLLP, William Shaffer, Paul Strobel, Texas Research, Limited Liability Company and Clifford R. Williams
Counter Defendant: Gold Resources of Nevada, LLC and Target Strike, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Marston Environmental, Inc. and Marston & Marston, Inc.
Cross Claimant: Clifford R. Williams
Case Number: 5:2010cv00188
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L. Garcia
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 322 SEVENTEENTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to GRANT 180 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Crissman Capps, Clifford R. Williams. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 8/28/11, by certified mail or forwarded electronically) (rf)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 SIXTEENTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 200 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lou B. Kost, Jr., ADDKO, Inc., Sadik Al-Bassam, L.K. & C.A., Inc., Crandell Addington, Texas Research, Limited Liability Company, Resurrection Canyon, LLLP, Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd, Resurrection Canyon, Inc. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (Served by certfied mail or electronic transmittal)(tm)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 FIFTEENTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to GRANT 198 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 8/15/11, by certified mail or forwarded electronically) (rf)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 FOURTEENTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 184 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gold Reef of Nevada, Inc., Gold Reef International, Inc. be granted and summary judgment be entered in favor of Gold Reef International, Inc. and Gold Reef of Nevada, Inc. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (Served by certified mail or electronic transmittal) (tm)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 298 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 288 Motion to Sever, filed by Texas Research, Limited Liability Company, ADDKO, Inc., William Shaffer, Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd, William J. Hartley, L.K. & C.A., Inc., 281 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Target Strike, Inc., be DENIED; 292 Motion for Hearing filed by Target Strike, Inc. DENYING as moot. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 7/1/2011 by certified mail, or sent via electronic transmittal)(rg)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ELEVENTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to DENY 282 Sealed Motion for leave to Supplement expert report filed by Target Strike, Inc.. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 6/6/11, by certified mail or forwarded electronically)(rf)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to GRANT 201 Sealed Motion filed by Crandell Addington, Lou B. Kost, Jr., Sadik Al-Bassam. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 4/19/11, by certified mail or forwarded electronically) (rf)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 259 EIGHTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 202 Sealed Motion filed by Texas Research, Limited Liability Company, ADDKO, Inc., Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd, L.K. & C.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 4/11/2011 by certified mail, or sent via electronic transmittal)(rg)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 194 Sealed Motion, filed by Marston & Marston, Inc., Marston Environmental, Inc. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (Served by certified mail or electronic transmittal)(tm)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 SIXTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to GRANT 185 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William J. Hartley and 186 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Shaffer. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. Mailed on 3/14/11, by certified mail or forwarded electronically) (rf)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER DENYING 166 Motion to exclude testimony. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rf)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re 122 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Gold Reef International, Inc. and Gold Reef of Nevada, Inc. filed by Target Strike, Inc., Gold Resources of Nevada, LLC. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rf)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 FIFTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to DENY 82 Motion to Withdraw case from jury docket. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (Mailed on 11/18/10, by certified mail or forwarded electronically)(rf)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 FOURTH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to DENY 60 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for More Definite Statement, Motion to Change Venue filed by Mexivada Mining Corporation. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 10/28/10, by certified mail or forwarded electronically)(rf)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 THIRD REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending to DENY 108 Motion to Compel, recommending to DENY as moot 125 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed on 10/26/10, by certified mail or forwarded electronically) (rf)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 93 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 93 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rf)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to DENY 32 Motion to Dismiss and 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (mailed 7/9/10, by certified mail or forwarded electronically)(rf)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING 6 Motion for More Definite Statement; DENYING 31 Motion for More Definite Statement Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (ga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Target Strike, Inc. v. Marston & Marston, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurrection Canyon, Inc.
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mexivada Mining Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panther Resources Partners, LLLP
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panther Resources, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Hartley
Represented By: George Cowden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou B. Kost, Jr.
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.K. & C.A., Inc.
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Reef International, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hurren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Reef of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hurren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marston Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Truss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marston & Marston, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Truss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Crissman Capps
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDKO, Inc.
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Chance Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crandell Addington
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadik Al-Bassam
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And Other Unkown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurrection Canyon, LLLP
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shaffer
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Strobel
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Research, Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford R. Williams
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Panther Resources Partners, LLLP
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Panther Resources, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Resurrection Canyon, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: William J. Hartley
Represented By: George Cowden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Lou B. Kost, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: L.K. & C.A., Inc.
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Lou Kost Holdings, Ltd
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: ADDKO, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Crandell Addington
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Sadik Al-Bassam
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Richard Crissman Capps
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Resurrection Canyon, LLLP
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: William Shaffer
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Paul Strobel
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Texas Research, Limited Liability Company
Represented By: John W. Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Clifford R. Williams
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gold Resources of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Alex L. Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Target Strike, Inc.
Represented By: Alex L. Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Resources of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Alex L. Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Strike, Inc.
Represented By: Alex L. Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Marston Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Truss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Marston & Marston, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Truss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Clifford R. Williams
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?