Lone Star Chapter Paralyzed Veterans of America et al v. City of San Antonio et al
Plaintiff: Lone Star Chapter Paralyzed Veterans of America and Skyeward Bound Ranch
Defendant: City of San Antonio and San Antonio Police Department
Case Number: 5:2010cv00316
Filed: April 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING 163 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (tm)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING as moot 113 Motion for Sanctions; DENYING as moot 113 Motion to Strike; Motion to compel within dkt no. 113 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 118 Motion to Vacate ; DENYING AS MOOT 126 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING 127 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (tm)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING 151 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (tm)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING 61 Motion to Strike ; GRANTING 103 Motion to Strike Testimony of Chris Canard filed under seal. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (tm)
February 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 87 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rg)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING 75 Motion for Leave to File interrogatories, requests for production and requests for admission outside of the discovery deadline. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rg)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL DENYING 65 Motion to Compel; DENYING 67 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rf)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 64 Motion to Compel; DENYING 64 Motion for Sanctions Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (ga)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 39 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party San Antonio Police Department. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (tm)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 5 Motion for TRO; DENYING 17 Motion for Bond. The Court will set this matter for a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (ga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lone Star Chapter Paralyzed Veterans of America et al v. City of San Antonio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lone Star Chapter Paralyzed Veterans of America
Represented By: Cynthia Hujar Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyeward Bound Ranch
Represented By: Cynthia Hujar Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?