W. v. Zirus et al
Plaintiff: C. W.
Defendant: Camp Stewart for Boys, Inc., Scott Ash James Zirus, Camp America and American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01044
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L. Garcia
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER DENYING 303 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Taking Motion Under Advisement re 217 Joint MOTION to Exclude Video Taped Interviews of Minors. The parties are ordered to file additional briefing no later than Monday, Spetember 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING as moot 154 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 80 Motion for Protective Order and to withdraw. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rg)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT 32 Motion for leave to file intervention; DENYING 40 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 42 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 58 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 61 Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 12 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING AS MOOT 21 Motion for Leave to File; DISMISSING AS MOOT 31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and GRANTING for serving disclosures is extended until July 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rg)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING 39 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nancy Stein Nowak. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. v. Zirus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Stewart for Boys, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk D. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ash James Zirus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan M. Rymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. W.
Represented By: Michael Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?