Deborah (Fiore) Labaty v. UWT, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Deborah (Fiore) Labaty
Defendant: Jeffrey Kelley, Paul Maxwell, Bruce Sands, Superior Gold Group, UWT, Inc. and United Western Administrative Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00389
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Docket No. 185) against Defendants Bruce Sands and Superior Gold Group. Plaintiff is entitled to damages in the amount of $150,000 and exemplary damages in the amount of $600,000. Judgment shall issue separately according to Rule 58. Plaintiff is awarded her costs of court and shall file a Bill of Costs pursuant to the Local Rules within fourteen days of the entry of the Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mr)
August 7, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 137 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 143 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 171 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
April 29, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 147 Sealed Motion, The Defendant's are Ordered to provide the same account documents and information relating to the July 7, 2009 transactions as they did for the stipulated accounts. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
March 24, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 124 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
March 5, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 112 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING 115 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
August 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING 14 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deborah (Fiore) Labaty v. UWT, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah (Fiore) Labaty
Represented By: Carl Pipoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Kelley
Represented By: Robert L. Soza, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Eric Vandenberg
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Maxwell
Represented By: Robert L. Soza, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Eric Vandenberg
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Gold Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UWT, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Soza, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Eric Vandenberg
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Western Administrative Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Soza, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Eric Vandenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?