Halprin et al v. First National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Edward Arriola, Kenny Arriola, Gregory Halprin, George Heywood, Craig Inaba, Hermann Kinschner, Les Klingerman, Andrew Nguyen, Brian Taus and Paul Weber
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, First National Bank, HTG Real Property Management, Inc., Mike Maldonado, Maria Del Rosario Padilla, Mauro Joe Padilla, Mauro T. Padilla, Padilla Property Corporation and Eric Sherer
Intervenor Plaintiff: Frederick D. Lee, Marian L. Lee, Nina E. Sirak and Raymond M. Sirak
Intervenor: Harbhajan Singh and Ravpreet Singh
Case Number: 5:2013cv01042
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L. Garcia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER MOOTING 427 Motion for Attorney Fees; GRANTING 429 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 430 Motion for Attorney Fees; GRANTING 432 Motion for Default Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 434 Motion for Default Judgment; GRANTING 435 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING 436 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bc)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER GRANTING 403 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 406 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 411 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (mgr)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER DENYING 390 Motion for Reconsideration re 390 MOTION for Reconsideration re 389 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (mgr)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER DENYING 264 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING AS MOOT 274 Motion to Strike; GRANTING 284 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER DENYING 257 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); DENYING 257 Motion for Leave to Appeal; DENYING 257 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (mgr)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER DENYING 244 Renewed Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER DENYING 233 Motion to Stay; DENYING 233 Motion to Sever Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (mgr)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER DENYING 224 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING 132 Motion to Dismiss by Eric Sherer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halprin et al v. First National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Arriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Arriola
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Halprin
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Heywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Inaba
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermann Kinschner
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Klingerman
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Nguyen
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Taus
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Weber
Represented By: Ernesto Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Richard R. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Loughborough McCamish
Represented By: Eric David Sherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank
Represented By: William Loughborough McCamish
Represented By: Eric David Sherer
Represented By: Richard R. Crow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTG Real Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Ramiro Estrada, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Maldonado
Represented By: Warren N. Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Del Rosario Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauro Joe Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauro T. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padilla Property Corporation
Represented By: Adam C. Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sherer
Represented By: Richard R. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Loughborough McCamish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Frederick D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marian L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nina E. Sirak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Raymond M. Sirak
Represented By: Lindsay Moore Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Harbhajan Singh
Represented By: Lindsay Moore Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ravpreet Singh
Represented By: Lindsay Moore Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?