The Hanover Insurance Company v. JA Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: JA Group, LLC, WPS Group, LLC doing business as Federal Management Solutions, Padron Enterprises, Inc., J & J Maintenance, Inc., Michael A. Padron, James Brian Taylor, Fameeda Taylor, Mapco, Inc., Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz, JOCH Enterprises, LLC doing business as JOCH Construction Company, Jose A. Gonzalez, Blackhawk Ventures, LLC, Ruben Villarreal and Manuelita Manrique Villarreal
Not Classified By Court: Jerry Hoover
3Rd Party Defendant: Time Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00609
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING #150 Judgment against Defendants JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, and Joe Alex Muniz in the amount of $1,765,631.77 plus costs of court and interest on the judgment at the legal rate. Plaintiff shall credit against the balance of this judgment the sum of any and all payments relating to the amounts sought in this lawsuit that it receives from or on behalf of any defendant after the date of the entry of this judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (lcrcl3)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Judgment Against Defendants JA Group, LLC, JAMCO Ventures, LLC, and Joe Alex Muniz by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed Agreed Judgment))(Delaune, Ryan)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 5/29/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Tish Moncivias.)(wg)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to agreed judgment and subject to reinstatement. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING #146 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Action. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Action by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING #144 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action Against J&J Maintenance, Inc. With Prejudice by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Delaune, Ryan)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER entering #142 agreed judgment against defendants JOCH Construction Company and Jose A. Gonzales. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Judgment by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Judgment Against Defendants JOCH Construction Company and Jose A. Gonzalez)(Delaune, Ryan)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting The Hanover Insurance Company's motion for summary judgment on damages against the defaulting defendants. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Telephone Conference held on 5/4/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(wg)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #138 Notice (Other) filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, ( Status Conference set for 5/29/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Royce C. Lamberth,) ( Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Royce C. Lamberth,). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE /PROPOSED Order Granting The Hanover Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages Against the Defaulting Defendants by The Hanover Insurance Company re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Delaune, Ryan)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Settlement to the Court by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC re #135 Order, Set Hearings (Bailey, Johnathan) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (wg).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE Supplemental Report on Mediation by J & J Maintenance, Inc. re #134 Status Report (Gaudet, Brian)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON PENDING MOTIONS( Telephone Conference on pending motions set for 5/4/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Royce C. Lamberth,). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mgr) Modified on 4/27/2020 (an).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STATUS REPORT (Joint Report on Mediation) by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Delaune, Ryan)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING re #118 MOTION for Hearing re #101 MOTION to Compel filed by JOCH Enterprises, LLC, Jose A. Gonzalez, GRANTED #115 MOTION for Hearing re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOCH Enterprises, LLC, Jose A. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DEFENDANTS, JOCH ENTERPRISES, LLC DBA JOCH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY AND JOSE GONZALEZ, SUR-REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO JOCHS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT to #123 Response, by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (mgr)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING #114 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING #89 #100 #103 Motions for Extension of Time, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Kingman, William)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #127 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE to #120 Miscellaneous Objection, by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #118 MOTION for Hearing re #101 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant JOCH Enterprises, LLC, Defendant Jose A. Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Delaune, Ryan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #114 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant JOCH Enterprises, LLC, Defendant Jose A. Gonzalez (Delaune, Ryan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE - HANOVER'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS JOCH ENTERPRISES, LLC DBA JOCH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY AND JOSE GONZALEZ'S RESPONSE TO ITS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE to #116 Response by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Delaune, Ryan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Joint ADR Report by J & J Maintenance, Inc., Time Insurance Agency, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company, Joe Alex Muniz, Jamco Ventures, LLC, JOCH Enterprises, LLC, JA Group, LLC, and Jose A. Gonzalez (Gaudet, Brian) Modified on 3/2/2020 To edit text (bc).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO ADD THE JOINT FILERS*** re #122 Notice (Other). (bc)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE - THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY'S REPLY TO J&J MAINTENANCE, INC.'S RESPONSE TO ITS OBJECTIONS TO J&J MAINTENANCE, INC.'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE to #113 Response by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Delaune, Ryan)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Miscellaneous Objection to #110 Response in Opposition to Motion, HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY'S OBJECTIONS TO JA GROUP, LLC, JAMCO VENTURES, LLC, AND JOE ALEX MUNIZ'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Delaune, Ryan)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company REPLY TO JA GROUP, LLC, JAMCO VENTURES, LLC, AND JOE MUNIZ'S RESPONSE (Delaune, Ryan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Hearing re #101 MOTION to Compel by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Johnathan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC, re #101 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant JOCH Enterprises, LLC, Defendant Jose A. Gonzalez (Bailey, Johnathan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE to #108 Miscellaneous Objection by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Bailey, Johnathan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Hearing re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Johnathan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Johnathan)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE to #106 Miscellaneous Objection by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Designation of Rebuttal Experts by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz (Kingman, William)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Gaudet, Brian)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz, re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRIES WERE MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE TEXT ENTRY*** re #107 Reply to Response to Motion, #105 Reply to Response to Motion. (bc)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #101 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant JOCH Enterprises, LLC, Defendant Jose A. Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Delaune, Ryan)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Miscellaneous Objection to #102 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company's Objections to JOCH's Summary Judgment Evidence by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Delaune, Ryan)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PLAINTIFF THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANYS REPLY TO JOCHS RESPONSE TO #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Delaune, Ryan) Modified on 2/18/2020 To edit text (bc).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Miscellaneous Objection to #98 Response to Motion, / Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company's Objections to J&J Maintenance, Inc.'s Summary Judgment Evidence by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Delaune, Ryan)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PLAINTIFF THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANYS REPLY TO J&J MAINTENANCE, INC.S RESPONSE TO #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Delaune, Ryan) Modified on 2/18/2020 To edit text (bc).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ATTACHMENT Corrected Exhibit 2 to #102 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Bailey, Johnathan)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC, re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Bailey, Johnathan)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Compel by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Johnathan)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Designation of Expert Witnesses by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bailey, Johnathan)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by J & J Maintenance, Inc., re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit C-2, #7 Exhibit C-3, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Designation of Expert Witnesses by The Hanover Insurance Company (Delaune, Ryan)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Designation of Testifying Experts by J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Gaudet, Brian)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING #92 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Johnathan)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING #90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 1-G, #9 Exhibit 2)(Delaune, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: ADR Report Deadline due by 3/23/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020, Discovery due by 5/8/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/8/2020, (wg)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER adopting proposed SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING #82 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING #81 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING #77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz.(Kingman, William)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Default Judgment against WPS GROUP, LLC D/B/A FEDERAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS; PADRON ENTERPRISES, INC.; MICHAEL A. PADRON; JAMES BRIAN TAYLOR; FAMEEDA TAYLOR; MAPCO, INC.; BLACKHAWK VENTURES, LLC; RUBEN VILLARREAL; AND MANUELITA MANRIQUE VILLARREAL by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Proposed Order)(Delaune, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #75 Amended Complaint by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Defendant J&J ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint by J & J Maintenance, Inc..(Gaudet, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Removal of Attorney from Case by J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Hester, Mason)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of JOINT REPORT by The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Delaune, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #75 Amended Complaint by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingman, William)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Brent Delaune on behalf of The Hanover Insurance Company. Attorney Ryan Brent Delaune added to party The Hanover Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Delaune, Ryan)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint, #21 Amended Complaint, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(aej)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEET & CONFER ORDER. See order for full details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (kjw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (kjw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING #65 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (kjw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING #64 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (kjw)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Weible, Benjamin)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by J & J Maintenance, Inc., re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order Denying)(Gaudet, Brian)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #65 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Weible, Benjamin)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by J & J Maintenance, Inc., re #65 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT MOTION*** re #65 MOTION to Compel. (aej)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order Granting Hanover's Motion to Compel and Denying J&J Maintenance's Motion for Entry of Protective Order to #65 Response to Motion by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Weible, Benjamin)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Compel and RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #64 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weible, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 3/5/2019 (aej).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gaudet, Brian)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Weible, Benjamin)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Master GIA Sept 1, 2013, #3 Exhibit 2 - MAPCO GIA Sept 1 2013, #4 Exhibit 3 - JA Group GIA Sept 1 2014, #5 Exhibit 4 - JAMCO Ventures GIA Oct 15 2014, #6 Exhibit 5 - JOCH Ent MAPCO GIA July 27 2015, #7 Exhibit 6 - Demand Letters May 20 2016 & June 20 2016, #8 Exhibit 7 - Blackhawk Ventures GIA Sept 1 2013, #9 Exhibit 8 - Demand Letter July 11 2016, #10 Exhibit 9 - List of Bonds)(Weible, Benjamin)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 J&J First Amended ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, of Hanover, Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Time Insurance Agency, Inc. by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gaudet, Brian)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING #43 Motion to Strike ; GRANTING #43 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (aej)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (aej)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth for all proceedings. Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Duncan L. Clore (Clore, Duncan)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Blackhawk Ventures, LLC, Mapco, Inc., Michael A. Padron, Padron Enterprises, Inc., Fameeda Taylor, James Brian Taylor, Manuelita Manrique Villarreal, Ruben Villarreal, WPS Group, LLC (aej)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Manuelita Manrique Villarreal by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Entry of Default against Ruben Villarreal by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Entry of Default against Michael Padron by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Entry of Default against James Brian Taylor by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Entry of Default against Fameeda Taylor by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Entry of Default against Blackhawk Ventures, LLC by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Entry of Default against WPS Group, LLC dba Federal Management Solutions by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Entry of Default against Mapco, Inc. by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Entry of Default against Padron Enterprises, Inc. by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by J & J Maintenance, Inc., re #43 MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Scott, Natalie)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #43 MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Clore, Duncan)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Scott, Natalie)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C, #4 Proposed Order)(Hester, Mason). Added MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer on 10/13/2016 (rf).
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Time Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Anderson, Rick)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Michael A. Padron served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. WPS Group, LLC served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Padron Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Fameeda Taylor served on 9/9/2016, answer due 9/30/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. James Brian Taylor served on 9/9/2016, answer due 9/30/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Mapco, Inc. served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; J & J Maintenance, Inc. answer due 9/26/2016. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by J & J Maintenance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Natalie)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie B. Scott on behalf of J & J Maintenance, Inc.. Attorney Natalie B. Scott added to party J & J Maintenance, Inc.(pty:3pp), Attorney Natalie B. Scott added to party J & J Maintenance, Inc.(pty:dft) (Scott, Natalie)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Mapco, Inc., Michael A. Padron, Padron Enterprises, Inc., Fameeda Taylor, James Brian Taylor, WPS Group, LLC. (aej)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Clore, Duncan)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Manuelita Manrique Villarreal served on 8/25/2016, answer due 9/15/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Ruben Villarreal served on 8/25/2016, answer due 9/15/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Blackhawk Ventures, LLC served on 8/25/2016, answer due 9/15/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint . Attorney Rick V. Anderson added to party Time Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:3pd) by Time Insurance Agency, Inc..(Anderson, Rick)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney William Brand Kingman added to party JA Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Brand Kingman added to party Jamco Ventures, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Brand Kingman added to party Joe Alex Muniz(pty:dft) by JA Group, LLC, Jamco Ventures, LLC, Joe Alex Muniz.(Kingman, William)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Manuelita Manrique Villarreal, Ruben Villarreal. (aej)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Clore, Duncan)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Blackhawk Ventures, LLC. (aej)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Clore, Duncan)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blackhawk Ventures, LLC, Ruben Villarreal, Manuelita Manrique Villarreal amending, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Clore, Duncan)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Christopher Gerald Burwell added to party Jose A. Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Gerald Burwell added to party JOCH Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft) by Jose A. Gonzalez, JOCH Enterprises, LLC.(Burwell, Christopher)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Assignment of Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after any defendant has appeared. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Time Insurance Agency, Inc. (aej)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Time Insurance Agency, Inc. by J & J Maintenance, Inc.(aej)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. J & J Maintenance, Inc. served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Mapco, Inc. served on 7/7/2016, answer due 7/28/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. JA Group, LLC served on 7/6/2016, answer due 7/27/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. WPS Group, LLC served on 7/6/2016, answer due 7/27/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Jose A. Gonzalez served on 7/7/2016, answer due 7/28/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. JOCH Enterprises, LLC served on 7/7/2016, answer due 7/28/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Jamco Ventures, LLC served on 7/6/2016, answer due 7/27/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Joe Alex Muniz served on 7/6/2016, answer due 7/27/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Padron Enterprises, Inc. served on 7/7/2016, answer due 7/28/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Michael A. Padron served on 7/7/2016, answer due 7/28/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. James Brian Taylor served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Fameeda Taylor served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. (Clore, Duncan)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aej)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Clore, Duncan)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Clore, Duncan)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-8607236), filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clore, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hanover Insurance Company v. JA Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin L. Weible
Represented By: Christopher R. Ward
Represented By: Ryan Brent Delaune
Represented By: Duncan L. Clore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA Group, LLC
Represented By: William Brand Kingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPS Group, LLC doing business as Federal Management Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padron Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Lee Sklencar
Represented By: Brian R. Gaudet
Represented By: Mason Post Hester
Represented By: Natalie B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brian Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fameeda Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamco Ventures, LLC
Represented By: William Brand Kingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Alex Muniz
Represented By: William Brand Kingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOCH Enterprises, LLC doing business as JOCH Construction Company
Represented By: Johnathan M. Bailey
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Johnathan M. Bailey
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuelita Manrique Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jerry Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Time Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg S. Weinberg
Represented By: Rick V. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?