Porter v. USA

Plaintiff: Billy Julius Porter, Jr.
Defendant: Aaron Villalpando and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2018cv00641
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Consolidate Cases Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 24, 2018 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Gilligan, James)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court due by 8/24/2018,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Recommendations)(mgr)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Billy Julius Porter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaints)(mgr)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party Notice of Substitution and Application for Order Thereon filed by Aaron Villalpando, Aaron Villalpando terminated. ORDERED that the style of the lawsuit shall be amended, as set forth above, to remove the name of Aaron Villalpando in his individual capacity based upon the substitution of the United States for the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Aaron Villalpando, United States shall be ordered to be allowed to file its response to the Plaintiff's Original Complaint/Petition on or before sixty (60) days after service is made on the United States Attorney in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 (i)(1)(a). Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
June 26, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
June 26, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Aaron Villalpando. (Gilligan, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party Notice of Substitution and Application for Order Thereon by Aaron Villalpando. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit Certifications)(Gilligan, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aaron Villalpando (Filing fee $400), filed by Aaron Villalpando. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilligan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Julius Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Villalpando
Represented By: James F. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James F. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?