Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. v. Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.
Defendant: Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.
Counter Plaintiff: Valero Energy Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv00739
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2018 13 CORRECTED ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Interpleader Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd., Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. by Valero Energy Corporation.(Abrams, Barry)
September 12, 2018 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PAGES*** re #11 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, (aej)
September 12, 2018 11 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PAGES*** ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Interpleader Counterclaim. Attorney Barry Abrams added to party Valero Energy Corporation(pty:gar), COUNTERCLAIM against Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd., Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. by Valero Energy Corporation.(Abrams, Barry) Modified on 9/12/2018 (aej).
September 7, 2018 10 NOTICE of Restrained Assets and Re-Confirmation Regarding Ongoing Adversarial Proceedings by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huffman, Jay)
July 30, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huffman, Jay)
July 23, 2018 Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT NO SIGNING JUDGE*** re #4 Order, #8 Order. (aej)
July 20, 2018 8 Amended Process of Attachment and Garnishment. (aej) Modified docket text on 7/23/2018 (aej).
July 20, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. amending, filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Huffman, Jay)
July 18, 2018 4 Process of Attachment and Garnishment. (aej) Modified docket text on 7/23/2018 (aej).
July 18, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
July 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
July 18, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11021842). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huffman, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. v. Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Barry Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Jay Todd Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?