Minnwest Bank V. Central USA Wireless, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Minnwest Bank
Defendant: Susana Hildebrant, Christopher Hildebrant, Central USA Wireless, LLC, Christopher R. Hildebrant and Susanna Hildebrant
Case Number: 5:2018cv00780
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 11/13/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2018, Discovery due by 2/15/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2018, Motions due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Scheduling Recommendations by Minnwest Bank. (DeBard, Allen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen M. DeBard on behalf of Minnwest Bank. Attorney Allen M. DeBard added to party Minnwest Bank(pty:pla) (DeBard, Allen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susanna Hildebrant 08/23/2018 (DeBard, Allen)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susanna Hildebrant #4 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #1 Notice of Removal, (Scully, John)
July 31, 2018 Notice of Correction: ***Notified counsel that Christopher Hildebrant and Central USA Wireless were removed as filers from Notice of Removal filing. Also, Defendant's name has been updated and corrected.*** re #4 Attachment, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment, #2 Attachment. (bc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Letter to attorney Nisha P. Byers regarding attorney admission to the Western District of Texas (bc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Letter to attorney Jesse R. Lipcius regarding attorney admission to the Western District of Texas (bc)
July 30, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
July 30, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT to #3 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #1 Notice of Removal, by Susanna Hildebrant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C66 through C78, #2 Exhibit Ex. D, #3 Exhibit Ex. E)(Scully, John) Modified on 7/31/2018 Edited text to correct the spelling of defendant's name. (bc).
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT C37 through C65 to #2 Attachment, #1 Notice of Removal, by Susanna Hildebrant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C37 through C65)(Scully, John) Modified on 7/31/2018 Edited text to correct the spelling of defendant's name. (bc).
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT C21 through C35 to #1 Notice of Removal, by Susanna Hildebrant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C21 thrugh C35)(Scully, John) Modified on 7/31/2018 Edited text to correct the spelling of defendant's name. (bc).
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Susanna Hildebrant, (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11064947), filed by Susanna Hildebrant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibits C01 thru Exhibit C20)(Scully, John) Modified on 7/31/2018 Edited text to remove filer- Minnwest Bank(bc). Modified on 7/31/2018, to remove filers and edit text (rf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnwest Bank V. Central USA Wireless, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Hildebrant
Represented By: John A. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hildebrant
Represented By: John A. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central USA Wireless, LLC
Represented By: John A. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Hildebrant
Represented By: John A. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanna Hildebrant
Represented By: John A. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnwest Bank
Represented By: Allen M. DeBard
Represented By: Steven Bruce Treu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?