EEOC v. United Airlines, Inc. Featured Case

The Equal Employment Opportunity Commission alleged that Defendant United Airlines discriminated against Jane Doe by subjecting her to harassment because of her sex, which created, enabled and perpetrated a hostile work environment from which she did not receive protections or relief by her employer, in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act. Specifically, Defendant allegedly failed to take preventative or corrective action in response to Doe's complaint that United Airlines Captain Uhlenbrock regularly posted sexually explicit photos, videos and stories about Doe on the internet, which mentioned her name, occupation and home airport.

Plaintiff: EEOC
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00817
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/21/2018, (wg)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Proposed scheduling order due on or before Nov. 21, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolph, Ada)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Palamountain, Kathryn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EEOC as to All Defendants. (Moss, Philip)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn C. Palamountain on behalf of Gerald L. Pauling ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11223156) by on behalf of United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palamountain, Kathryn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn C. Palamountain on behalf of Ada W. Dolph ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11223088) by on behalf of United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palamountain, Kathryn)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathryn C. Palamountain on behalf of United Airlines, Inc.. Attorney Kathryn C. Palamountain added to party United Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Palamountain, Kathryn)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by EEOC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moss, Philip)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by EEOC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moss, Philip)
August 9, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
August 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEOC v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald L. Pauling
Represented By: Ada W. Dolph
Represented By: Kathryn C. Palamountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Edward Juarez
Represented By: Philip Jonathan Moss
Represented By: Robert A. Canino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?