Wilson v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Tricia L Wilson
Counter Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
3Rd Party Defendant: Heidemarie Gilbert
Case Number: 5:2018cv00930
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion to Stay Deposit of Insurance Funds. Within 30 days the Parties are ORDERED to provide the Court with an update regarding settlement discussions and the ongoing need for the stay. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
October 18, 2018 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay On and Extension For Deposit of Funds by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seybold, Steven)
October 18, 2018 12 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim , ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tricia L Wilson, Tricia L Wilson.(Longoria, A.)
October 12, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #9 Unopposed Motion to Deposit Funds. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
October 11, 2018 11 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Tricia L Wilson, Tricia L Wilson, re #9 Opposed MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Longoria, A.)
October 11, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File a Response. The new deadline to file a response is October 12, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
October 10, 2018 10 MOTION to Continue Defendant's Opposed Motion for Deposit Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 67 by Tricia L Wilson, Tricia L Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Longoria, A.)
October 3, 2018 9 Opposed MOTION to Deposit Funds by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Davis, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Charles Davis, #3 Proposed Order)(Seybold, Steven)
October 2, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #7 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order and to Confer Pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and to Extend Deadline For Plaintiffs to Answer Counterclaim filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/10/2018). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
September 28, 2018 7 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order and to Confer Pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and to Extend Deadline For Plaintiffs to Answer Counterclaim by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seybold, Steven)
September 17, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Heidemarie Gilbert. (aej)
September 17, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Seybold, Steven)
September 14, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Heidemarie Gilbert, Tricia L Wilson, COUNTERCLAIM against Heidemarie Gilbert, Tricia L Wilson by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (aej)
September 10, 2018 3 Featured Case Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
September 7, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
September 7, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
September 7, 2018 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Seybold, Steven)
September 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11206268), filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Seybold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia L Wilson
Represented By: Thomas Dale Jones
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven D. Seybold
Represented By: Paul Schlaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Heidemarie Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?