Roy Smith v. San Antonio Wings, Inc.,et.al.
Plaintiff: Roy Smith
Defendant: San Antonio Wings, Inc. and CNL Wings, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01067
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Remand entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for San Antonio Wings to file a response to the Motion to Remand is extended until December 10, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by San Antonio Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schultz, Theodore)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Remand to State Court by Roy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Remand)(Tilton, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael S. Tilton. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Willard William Clark, III for Michael S. Tilton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11429237) by on behalf of Roy Smith. (Clark, Willard)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willard William Clark, III on behalf of Roy Smith. Attorney Willard William Clark, III added to party Roy Smith(pty:pla) (Clark, Willard)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by San Antonio Wings, Inc.. (Treat, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Remark: Letter of Non-Admission to the WDTX/forwarded to Attys: Michael S. Tilton & John A. Caston. (wg)
October 10, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by San Antonio Wings, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11325081), filed by San Antonio Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Schultz, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy Smith v. San Antonio Wings, Inc.,et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Wings, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore C. Schultz
Represented By: David Lawrence Treat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNL Wings, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore C. Schultz
Represented By: David Lawrence Treat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Smith
Represented By: Michael S. Tilton
Represented By: Willard William Clark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?