Guzman et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Guzman and David Guzman
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11
Counter Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 5:2018cv01087
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT & ORDER AUTHORIZING FORECLOSURE, Motions terminated: #7 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Final Judgment filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc... Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Final Judgment by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM against David Guzman, Sandra Guzman, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc.,Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11(wg)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk shall file Defendant's Original Counterclaims. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (md)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT of Consent to Mag.Jurisdiction by David Guzman, Sandra Guzman. (Cano, Edward) Modified on 10/26/2018 (wg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11. (Hord, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Original Counterclaims for Order Authorizing Judicial Foreclosure by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due November 19, 2018); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw)
October 15, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
October 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11343080), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplement)(Hord, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Hord, Jr.
Represented By: Eric C. Mettenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 20016-11
Represented By: Michael F. Hord, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Guzman
Represented By: Edward Paul Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guzman
Represented By: Edward Paul Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Michael F. Hord, Jr.
Represented By: Eric C. Mettenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?