JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. v. The Uresti Law Firm, PLLC, et al
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Defendant: Carlos Uresti and The Uresti Law Firm, PLLC
Counter Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv01098
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/11/2019, (wg)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to file the scheduling order is extended through January 11, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION To Extend The Time To File A Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States of America. (Giese, Erica)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Simpson, Susan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carlos Uresti. (aej)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. (aej)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States of America. (Giese, Erica)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due November 19, 2018); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw)
October 17, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
October 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 17, 2018 Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO REMOVE THE $400.00 FILING FEE WORDING*** re #1 Notice of Removal, (bc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 COUNTERCLAIM against JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., The Uresti Law Firm, PLLC, Carlos Uresti, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lien filed in Bexar County by DOJ, #2 Exhibit B - Special Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Chase Deed of Trust)(Giese, Erica)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet C - JS44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement D - JS44 Supplement)(Giese, Erica) Modified on 10/17/2018 to remove filing fee (bc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. v. The Uresti Law Firm, PLLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Uresti
Represented By: John J. Ritenour, Jr.
Represented By: Rashin Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Uresti Law Firm, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erica Benites Giese
Represented By: Steven E. Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Susan Oliver Simpson
Represented By: Thomas M. Sellers
Represented By: K. Mark Vincent
Represented By: Scott E. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?