Howard v. The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Precious Tamika Howard
Defendant: The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2018cv01100
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
0 Judge: Richard B Farrer
1 Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Precious Tamika Howard. (aej)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Precious Tamika Howard. The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (aej)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued and USM285 Forms as to The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (aej)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Precious Tamika Howard. and Forms 285 (Jacques, Andree)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Precious Tamika Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aej)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (aej)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Precious Tamika Howard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs)
October 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs)
October 18, 2018 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (fs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Tamika Howard
Represented By: Andree Renee Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?