Tilleman v. LeafFilter North, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Tilleman
Defendant: LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC and LeafFilter North, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01152
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Final Approval Hearing held on 11/25/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(mgr)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RESETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING ( Final Approval Hearing reset for 11/25/2019 2:00 PM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Supplementary Declaration of Settlement Administrator by Michael W. Tilleman re #25 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplementary Declaration of Jeremy Neville)(Federman, William)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: MISSING PROPOSED ORDER. Please do not re-file the entire document, please only file the proposedorder using the Attachment Event and link to the Motion. re #26 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses, and Service Award to Representative Plaintiff (mgr)
October 27, 2019 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -MISSING PROPOSED ORDER***Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses, and Service Award to Representative Plaintiff by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William B. Federman in Support, #2 Exhibit Lodestar, #3 Exhibit Expenses)(Federman, William) Modified on 10/28/2019 (mgr).
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Jeremy Neville, KCC, #3 Exhibit 2 Proposed Final Order and Judgment)(Federman, William)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Unopposed Motion for Final Approval) by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Federman, William)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER, ( Final Approval Hearing set for 11/25/2019 1:30 PM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support, filed by Michael W. Tilleman, re #20 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement [Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement] filed by Plaintiff Michael W. Tilleman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ponemon Study, #3 Exhibit 3 - William B. Federman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - KCC Bio)(Federman, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement [Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement] by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Federman, William)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation [Plaintiff's Brief in Support of his Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement] by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Federman, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by William B. Federman (Federman, William)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESETTING DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF JOINT STIPULATION. Based upon the information in the joint stipulation, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff Michael W. Tilleman file his Motion for PreliminaryApproval on or before May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Advise of Mediated Settlement, Take Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline Off Calendar, and to Set Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC, LeafFilter North, LLC. (Gomez, Michelle)
February 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines: LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC answer due 4/29/2019; LeafFilter North, LLC answer due 4/29/2019. (rf)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge David A. Ezra. The new deadline is April 29, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Third Unopposed) by LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC, LeafFilter North, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint)(Karlsgodt, Paul)
December 19, 2018 Reset Deadlines: LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC answer due 2/28/2019; LeafFilter North, LLC answer due 2/28/2019. (rf)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until February 28, 2019 entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC, LeafFilter North, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (1))(Karlsgodt, Paul)
November 28, 2018 Reset Deadlines: LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC answer due 12/21/2018. (mgr)
November 28, 2018 LeafFilter North, LLC answer due 12/21/2018.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul G. Karlsgodt. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge David A. Ezra. The new deadline to file to respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint is December 21, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge David A. Ezra. The new deadline to file the Answer is December 21, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle R. Gomez for Paul G. Karlsgodt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11493016) by on behalf of LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC, LeafFilter North, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gomez, Michelle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC. (Gomez, Michelle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LeafFilter North, LLC. (Gomez, Michelle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gomez, Michelle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LeafFilter North, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gomez, Michelle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael W. Tilleman. LeafFilter North, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Federman, William)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael W. Tilleman. LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Federman, William)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC. (mgr)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michael W. Tilleman. (Federman, William)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC, LeafFilter North, LLC. (mgr)
November 2, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
November 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT Exhibit 1 to #1 Complaint by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated October 4, 2018)(Federman, William)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michael W. Tilleman. (Federman, William)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11413976), filed by Michael W. Tilleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Federman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilleman v. LeafFilter North, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Tilleman
Represented By: William B. Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeafFilter North of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Michelle R. Gomez
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeafFilter North, LLC
Represented By: Michelle R. Gomez
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?