Rozell et al v. Lowe
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Appellant: Francis McQueen Rozell, Jr., Clarita Sommers Johnson and Francis McQueen Rozelle, Jr.
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Case Number: 5:2018cv01168
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (wg)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, The motion to dismiss the appeal as interlocutory (docket no. 2) is GRANTED and this appeal is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this matter. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 1/9/2019, (wg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court - Appellants' Designated Record on Appeal is Complete. NOTICE - Record is Available Electronically: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), notice is hereby provided that the Record on Appeal, as designated by the Appellants, is available electronically via PACER (www.pacer.gov) in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Texas, Chapter 7 case no. 14-51480 (In re Francis McQueen Rozelle, Jr.) and 14-51484 (In re Clarita Sommers Johnson). (Attachments: #1 Appellants' Designation of the Record on Appeal, #2 Orders on Appeal (and Related Pleadings), #3 Transcript (Restricted) of 10.02.2018 Hearing, #4 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet (Case No. 14-51480 Rozelle), #5 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet (Case No. 14-51484 Johnson)) (Lawson, Rob)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 APPELLANT'S RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal from Interlocutory Orders by Clarita Sommers Johnson, Francis McQueen Rozell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-F, #6 Exhibit G)(wg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal from Interlocutory Orders by John Patrick Lowe. (Autry, Patrick)
November 7, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
November 7, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Orders on Appeal, #3 Orders on Appeal, #4 Orders on Appeal, #5 Orders on Appeal, #6 List of Parties) (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozell et al v. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Represented By: Patrick H. Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Francis McQueen Rozell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clarita Sommers Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Francis McQueen Rozelle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?