Jones v. Military Warriors Support Foundation

Plaintiff: Kevin Jones
Defendant: Military Warriors Support Foundation
Case Number: 5:2018cv01266
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Military Warriors Support Foundation.(Hodges, John)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Jones as to Military Warriors Support Foundation. Waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Galo, Michael)
December 5, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
December 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11521585). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kevin Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Galo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Military Warriors Support Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jones
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Warriors Support Foundation
Represented By: John W. Hodges, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?