L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815

Plaintiff: L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815
Case Number: 5:2018cv01278
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
0 Judge: Henry J Bemporad
1 Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 2/19/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
December 21, 2018 7 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815, re #3 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815 (Jones, Paige)
December 21, 2018 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815, re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Jones, Paige)
December 14, 2018 5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC, re #3 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Klein, Hunter)
December 14, 2018 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Klein, Hunter)
December 7, 2018 3 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Jones, Paige)
December 6, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
December 6, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815. (Jones, Paige)
December 6, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11526657), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW0144815
Represented By: Paige C. Jones
Represented By: Alicia A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&S Tri Star Investments, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Represented By: Hunter M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?