Owens v. CPS Energy

Plaintiff: Samuel L Owens
Defendant: CPS Energy, David Miller, Gilbert Brown, Clevette Hall and Richard Lujan
Case Number: 5:2018cv01313
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendant's Answer #1 Notice of Removal,(c) Answer by Samuel L Owens. (rg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Samuel L Owens. (rg)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Resetting Status Conference for 3/14/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Setting Status Conference and Hearing on all Pending Motions for 3/7/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/12/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/28/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019, Discovery due by 6/17/2019, Motions due by 7/17/2019,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by CPS Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reinhard, Christine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Report by CPS Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reinhard, Christine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Scheduling Order by CPS Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reinhard, Christine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by CPS Energy. (Reinhard, Christine)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Samuel L Owens. (rg)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due January 17, 2019); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw)
December 14, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
December 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CPS Energy (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11558761), filed by CPS Energy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Supplement)(Reinhard, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. CPS Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel L Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPS Energy
Represented By: Shannon B. Schmoyer
Represented By: Delilah S. Evans
Represented By: Christine Elaine Reinhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clevette Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?