United States of America v. $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency

Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Claimant: Keath White
Case Number: 5:2018cv01323
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 A)(Valadez, Mary)
February 11, 2019 6 VERIFIED CLAIM OF Keath White as to $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency (Major, Abasi) Modified on 2/11/2019 (rg).
February 11, 2019 5 NOTICE of Appearance as Counsel for Claimant by $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency (Major, Abasi)
January 16, 2019 4 FORFEITURE ORDER Returned Executed on $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency on 01/14/2019. (mo)
December 27, 2018 3 Warrant for Arrest of Property Issued for $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency (rg)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
December 20, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
December 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
December 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE Verified Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Warrant, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valadez, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary Nelda Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: $24,890.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Keath White
Represented By: Abasi Daudi Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?