United States of America v. Robert R. Wetz, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert R Wetz, Debra S Wetz, Robert Wetz Chiropractic Clinic P.A., PNC Bank National Association, Debra S. Wetz and Robert R. Wetz
Case Number: 5:2018cv01338
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. PNC Bank National Association served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Page, Stephanie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Robert Wetz Chiropractic Clinic P.A. served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Page, Stephanie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Debra S. Wetz served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Page, Stephanie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Robert R. Wetz served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Page, Stephanie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC Bank National Association, Robert Wetz Chiropractic Clinic P.A., Debra S. Wetz, Robert R. Wetz amending #1 Complaint., filed by United States of America.(Page, Stephanie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PNC Bank National Association, Robert Wetz Chiropractic Clinic P.A., Debra S. Wetz, Robert R. Wetz. (wg)
December 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf)
December 28, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Page, Stephanie)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Page, Stephanie) Modified on 1/2/2019, to edit text (rf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Robert R. Wetz, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R Wetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra S Wetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wetz Chiropractic Clinic P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra S. Wetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Wetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie M. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?