Payne et al v. City of San Antonio, Texas, et al

Plaintiff: Don Albert Payne and Gloria Jean Payne
Defendant: Amy V. Carillo, City of San Antonio, Officer Shannon Purkiss, San Antonio Police Department, San Antonio Housing Authority, City of San Antonio, Texas, Amy V. Carrillo, Officer William Kasberg and Officer Gerardo Morales
Case Number: 5:2019cv00020
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Pro Se Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Don Albert Payne, Gloria Jean Payne, re #7 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Amy V. Carrillo (aej)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Pro Se Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Don Albert Payne, Gloria Jean Payne, re #10 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Defendant Amy V. Carrillo (aej)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Amy V. Carrillo, re #11 MOTION for Entry of Default against San Antonio Housing Authority and City of San Antonio filed by Plaintiff Don Albert Payne, Plaintiff Gloria Jean Payne (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennis, Stephen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default against San Antonio Housing Authority and City of San Antonio by Don Albert Payne, Gloria Jean Payne. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(aej)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Amy V. Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dennis, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE Memorandum of Facts and Law in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court by Don Albert Payne, Gloria Jean Payne. (aej) Modified on 2/4/2019 (aej).
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default against Amy V. Carrillo, William Kasberg, Gerardo Morales and Shannon Purkiss by Don Albert Payne, Gloria Jean Payne. (aej)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss by Amy V. Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennis, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT PLEADING NEEDS TO HAVE AN UPDATED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO REFLECT PROPER SERVICE*** re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (aej)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE NEEDS TO BE AMENDED*** MOTION to Dismiss by Amy V. Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennis, Stephen) Modified on 1/14/2019 (aej). Modified on 1/14/2019 (aej).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by City of San Antonio, Texas re #3 Pro Hac Vice Letter (Lewis, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Certificate of Notice by City of San Antonio, Texas (Lewis, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to attorney Andrew Segovia regarding admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc)
January 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of San Antonio (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11632720), filed by City of San Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pleadings from County Court, #2 Exhibit A-Pleadings from County Court, #3 Exhibit A-Pleadings from County Court, #4 Exhibit A-Pleadings from County Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement to JS 44)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne et al v. City of San Antonio, Texas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy V. Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Antonio
Represented By: William L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shannon Purkiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Antonio, Texas
Represented By: William L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy V. Carrillo
Represented By: Frank Scaglione
Represented By: Stephen Taylor Dennis
Represented By: Benjamin V. Lugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer William Kasberg
Represented By: William L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gerardo Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Albert Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Jean Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?