Camacho et al v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Jose L Camacho, Luis E Camacho, Maria Camacho and Fabian E Camacho
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00023
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company. (Kennamer, Alison)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Fabian E Camacho, Jose L Camacho, Luis E Camacho, Maria Camacho. (Armstrong, Ronald)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due March 12, 2019); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint [Document No. 1]. Attorney Alison Diane Kennamer added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) by Ford Motor Company.(Kennamer, Alison)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdxr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald W. Armstrong, II on behalf of Lee Brown ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11641558) by on behalf of Fabian E Camacho, Jose L Camacho, Luis E Camacho, Maria Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Licenses/Court's Admitted, #2 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Ronald)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Re-Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (rg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fabian E Camacho, Jose L Camacho, Luis E Camacho, Maria Camacho. AMENDED (Armstrong, Ronald)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (bc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to attorney Lee Brown regarding admission to the Western District of Texas. (bc)
January 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fabian E Camacho, Jose L Camacho, Luis E Camacho, Maria Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original Complaint)(Armstrong, Ronald)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11633865), filed by Luis E Camacho, Jose L Camacho, Fabian E Camacho, Maria Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Armstrong, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L Camacho
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Nathaniel Mack, III
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis E Camacho
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Nathaniel Mack, III
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Camacho
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Nathaniel Mack, III
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian E Camacho
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Nathaniel Mack, III
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Alison Diane Kennamer
Represented By: Jaime Arturo Saenz
Represented By: Warren E. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?