Richard et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing

Plaintiff: Erica F Richard and Ronald Richard
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing
Case Number: 5:2019cv00029
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 4/12/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019, Discovery due by 7/12/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 5/10/2019, Motions due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Recommendations by Select Portfolio Servicing. (Johnson, Grant)
January 18, 2019 Remark: On 1/18/2019, Docket Entry #3 and Docket Entry #4 were re-sent to Attorney, Jason E. Galvan at his current address: Jason E. Galvan - Law Office of Jason Galvan - P.O. Box 14141 - San Antonio, TX 78214-0141. (dtg)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assigment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to attorney. (aej)
January 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Select Portfolio Servicing. (Johnson, Grant)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Select Portfolio Servicing (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11637260), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court File), #2 Exhibit B (Comal County CAD), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supplemental)(Johnson, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica F Richard
Represented By: Jason E. Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Richard
Represented By: Jason E. Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing
Represented By: Matthew Justus Swantner
Represented By: Grant C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?