Shawna Marcia Ann Williams v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Shawna Marcia Ann Williams
Counter Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00033
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Manning, Matt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Knox, Matthew)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knox, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rg)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Knox, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11638722), filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement)(Manning, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawna Marcia Ann Williams v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Marcia Ann Williams
Represented By: Edward Paul Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A. Knox
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?