Martinez v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Delfina Alicia Martinez
Defendant: Latina Foster and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00035
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Delfina Alicia Martinez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Valdez, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in Alternative for Judgment on the Pleadings by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Valdez, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 4/5/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2019, Discovery due by 9/6/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 5/7/2019, Motions due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Recommendations JOINT Scheduling Recommendations by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Delfina Alicia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowland, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company's First Amended Answer by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Valdez, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
January 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (aej)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11639333), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latina Foster
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Represented By: Elena P. Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Represented By: Elena P. Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfina Alicia Martinez
Represented By: Joshua S. Hatley
Represented By: Michael Reeh Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?