Taha v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Mamdouh Sameeh Taha
Respondent: Reynaldo Castro, Daniel Bible, Matthew Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 5:2019cv00052
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mamdouh Sameeh Taha (Levy, Jonathan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt returned as Delivered of #8 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail returned executed of #8 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt of #4 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (mgr)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500047889 (mgr)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Jonathan Levy Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500047890. (mgr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt of #4 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (mgr)
February 1, 2019 Regenerated Petition (doc #1) to USA (mgr)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Levy for Mamdouh Sameeh Taha. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Levy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs) Modified on 1/23/2019 (fs).
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mamdouh Sameeh Taha. (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Copy of Envelope)(fs)
January 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs)
January 18, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (fs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taha v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reynaldo Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mamdouh Sameeh Taha
Represented By: Edna Yang
Represented By: Jonathan Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?