Texas League of United Latin American Citizens et al v. Whitley et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Texas League of United Latin American Citizens and National League of United Latin American Citizens (LULAC) sued the Texas secretary of state and attorney general under Section 11(b) of the Voting Rights Act, challenging their efforts to de-register or discourage people from voting.

Plaintiff: Texas League of United Latin American Citizens and National League of United Latin American Citizens
Defendant: David Whitley, Ken Paxton and Judge Cheryl Johnson
Petitioner: Betsy Schonhoff and Gayatri Vasan
Consolidated Plaintiff: Julieta Garibay, League of Women Voters of Texas, Lorena Tule-Romain, Maria Felicitas Barbosa, UnidosUS, Texas State Conference of NAACP Units, Nivien Saleh, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Organization of Chinese Americans-Greater Houston, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Maria Yolisma Garcia, John Doe #1, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Martine Hummel, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #1, Efren Gomez, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, JOLT Initiative, Hilda Castillo and Elena Keane
Consolidated Defendant: Connie Brown, Kim Rinn, Janet Torres, Beth Rothermel, Greg Abbot, Trudy Hancock, Keith Ingram, Crystal Denman, Mary Hope Barrera, Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Vicki T. Vogel, Kathryn Nealy, Karen Nelson, Gwenda L. Tschirhart, Kristen Spies, Cheryl E Johnson, Pamela Ohlendorf and Terri Hefner
Case Number: 5:2019cv00074
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 134 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AND ADVISORY - ORDER DENYING #81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Ken Paxton Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by David Whitley, Ken Paxton. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER (Setting In Camera Hearing for 4/29/2019 9:00 AM before Judge Fred Biery, Status Conference set for 4/29/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Fred Biery). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Terri Hefner, Cheryl E Johnson, Karen Nelson, Pamela Ohlendorf, Beth Rothermel, Kristen Spies, Janet Torres, re #81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consol Defendant Kristen Spies, Consol Defendant Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Consol Defendant Janet Torres, Consol Defendant Pamela Ohlendorf, Consol Defendant Karen Nelson, Consol Defendant Terri Hefner, Consol Defendant Cheryl E Johnson, Consol Defendant Beth Rothermel (Magee, Jason)
March 20, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Garibay's Third Amended class actionComplaint by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daaboul, Rola)
March 20, 2019 Filing 127 Defendants ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Ken Paxton, David Whitley.(Daaboul, Rola)
March 18, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Keith Ingram, David Whitley, re #81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consol Defendant Kristen Spies, Consol Defendant Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Consol Defendant Janet Torres, Consol Defendant Pamela Ohlendorf, Consol Defendant Karen Nelson, Consol Defendant Terri Hefner, Consol Defendant Cheryl E Johnson, Consol Defendant Beth Rothermel (Sweeten, Patrick)
March 18, 2019 Filing 125 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, re #81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consol Defendant Kristen Spies, Consol Defendant Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Consol Defendant Janet Torres, Consol Defendant Pamela Ohlendorf, Consol Defendant Karen Nelson, Consol Defendant Terri Hefner, Consol Defendant Cheryl E Johnson, Consol Defendant Beth Rothermel Plaintiffs Move Texas Civic Fund, et al.'s Response in Opposition to County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Downes, Brendan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 124 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 13, 2019 Filing 123 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 3/11/2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Poage, Telephone number: 210-244-5036 Email: chris_poage@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/3/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019, (Poage, Chris)
March 12, 2019 Filing 122 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Hilda Castillo, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Martine Hummel, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Organization of Chinese Americans-Greater Houston, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Perales, Nina)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING #119 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Ken Paxton answer due 3/20/2019; David Whitley answer due 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 12, 2019 Filing 120 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Texas Tribune))(Vera, Luis)
March 12, 2019 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fred Biery: Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2019. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(rg)
March 11, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE Garibay Plaintiffs' Response to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Hilda Castillo, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Martine Hummel, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Organization of Chinese Americans-Greater Houston, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, UnidosUS (Perales, Nina)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 115 Proposed Findings of Fact by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Hilda Castillo, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Organization of Chinese Americans-Greater Houston, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Perales, Nina)
March 7, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Exhibits in Support of Garibay Plaintiffs' Re-Urged Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Hilda Castillo, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Martine Hummel, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 85, #2 Exhibit 86, #3 Exhibit 87, #4 Exhibit 88, #5 Exhibit 89, #6 Exhibit 90, #7 Exhibit 91, #8 Exhibit 92)(Perales, Nina)
March 7, 2019 Filing 113 Proposed Findings of Fact by Julie Hilberg, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Nivien Saleh, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vera, Luis)
March 7, 2019 Filing 112 Proposed Findings of Fact by Greg Abbot, Keith Ingram, Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Daaboul, Rola)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #102 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chiraag Bains for Maria Felicitas Barbosa,Chiraag Bains for Viridiana Tule Carrizales,Chiraag Bains for Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores,Chiraag Bains for Maria Yolisma Garcia,Chiraag Bains for Julieta Garibay,Chiraag Bains for Efren Gomez,Chiraag Bains for Jane Doe #1,Chiraag Bains for Jane Doe #2,Chiraag Bains for Jane Doe #3,Chiraag Bains for John Doe #1,Chiraag Bains for Elena Keane,Chiraag Bains for La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.,Chiraag Bains for Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund,Chiraag Bains for Southwest Voter Registration Education Project,Chiraag Bains for Lorena Tule-Romain,Chiraag Bains for UnidosUS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING #101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patricia Yan for Maria Felicitas Barbosa,Patricia Yan for Viridiana Tule Carrizales,Patricia Yan for Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores,Patricia Yan for Maria Yolisma Garcia,Patricia Yan for Julieta Garibay,Patricia Yan for Efren Gomez,Patricia Yan for Jane Doe #1,Patricia Yan for Jane Doe #2,Patricia Yan for Jane Doe #3,Patricia Yan for John Doe #1,Patricia Yan for Elena Keane,Patricia Yan for La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.,Patricia Yan for Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund,Patricia Yan for Southwest Voter Registration Education Project,Patricia Yan for Lorena Tule-Romain,Patricia Yan for UnidosUS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING #100 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerry Vattamala for Maria Felicitas Barbosa,Jerry Vattamala for Viridiana Tule Carrizales,Jerry Vattamala for Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores,Jerry Vattamala for Maria Yolisma Garcia,Jerry Vattamala for Julieta Garibay,Jerry Vattamala for Efren Gomez,Jerry Vattamala for Jane Doe #1,Jerry Vattamala for Jane Doe #2,Jerry Vattamala for Jane Doe #3,Jerry Vattamala for John Doe #1,Jerry Vattamala for Elena Keane,Jerry Vattamala for La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.,Jerry Vattamala for Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund,Jerry Vattamala for Southwest Voter Registration Education Project,Jerry Vattamala for Lorena Tule-Romain,Jerry Vattamala for UnidosUS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING #99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eri Andriola for Maria Felicitas Barbosa,Eri Andriola for Viridiana Tule Carrizales,Eri Andriola for Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores,Eri Andriola for Maria Yolisma Garcia,Eri Andriola for Julieta Garibay,Eri Andriola for Efren Gomez,Eri Andriola for Jane Doe #1,Eri Andriola for Jane Doe #2,Eri Andriola for Jane Doe #3,Eri Andriola for John Doe #1,Eri Andriola for Elena Keane,Eri Andriola for La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.,Eri Andriola for Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund,Eri Andriola for Southwest Voter Registration Education Project,Eri Andriola for Lorena Tule-Romain,Eri Andriola for UnidosUS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING #98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Niyati Shah for Maria Felicitas Barbosa,Niyati Shah for Viridiana Tule Carrizales,Niyati Shah for Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores,Niyati Shah for Maria Yolisma Garcia,Niyati Shah for Julieta Garibay,Niyati Shah for Efren Gomez,Niyati Shah for Jane Doe #1,Niyati Shah for Jane Doe #2,Niyati Shah for Jane Doe #3,Niyati Shah for John Doe #1,Niyati Shah for Elena Keane,Niyati Shah for La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.,Niyati Shah for Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund,Niyati Shah for Southwest Voter Registration Education Project,Niyati Shah for Lorena Tule-Romain,Niyati Shah for UnidosUS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. (Motion filed in Member Case SA-19-CV-159). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andre Ivan Segura. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brian Phillip Klosterboer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting Robert Barron Boemer to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy for Chiraag Bains ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11846133) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Patricia Yan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11846039) by on behalf of Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Jerry Vattamala ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11845989) by on behalf of Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Eri Andriola ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11845907) by on behalf of Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Niyati Shah ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11845796) by on behalf of Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 97 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Abbot, Mary Hope Barrera, Connie Brown, Crystal Denman, Trudy Hancock, Cheryl E Johnson, Kathryn Nealy, Karen Nelson, Ken Paxton, Bob Reeves, Kim Rinn, Kristen Spies, Gwenda L. Tschirhart, Vicki T. Vogel, David Whitley, Laura Wise amending complaint, filed by Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Elena Keane, Jane Doe #2, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Efren Gomez, Julieta Garibay, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Jane Doe #1, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Hilda Castillo, Martine Hummel, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Organization of Chinese Americans-Greater Houston.(rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING #73 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on or before March 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on or before March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brenda Wright. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart Naifeh. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Nwachukwu. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon Greenbaum. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ezra Rosenberg. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brendan Downes. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sophia Lin Lakin. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joaquin Robert Gonzalez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING #82 Motion for leave to file Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 83 Reply in Support of Garibay Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 (filed in SA-19-CV-159) #19 by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS re #54 Response (Perales, Nina) Modified on 3/5/2019 (rg).
March 4, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Amend Complaint for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Garibay Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Garibay Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)(Perales, Nina)
March 4, 2019 Filing 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Terri Hefner, Cheryl E Johnson, Karen Nelson, Pamela Ohlendorf, Beth Rothermel, Kristen Spies, Janet Torres. (Magee, Jason)
March 4, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE / Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction to #54 Response by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 79 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING #75 Motion to intervene by Public Interest Legal Foundation. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER the Court APPROVES the Secretarys proposed advisory with the orders of the Court attached re #74 Advisory to the Court filed by David Whitley. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #74 Advisory to the Court by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Vera, Luis)
March 1, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Intervene by Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Taylor, Andy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 74 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 28, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of PI Motion)(Perales, Nina)
February 28, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Exhibits by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, JOLT Initiative, Nivien Saleh. Kristen Spies served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, JOLT Initiative, Nivien Saleh. Terri Hefner served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, JOLT Initiative, Nivien Saleh. Elections Administrator for Harrison County served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, JOLT Initiative, Nivien Saleh. Janet Torres served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy for Brenda Wright ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11822964) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 66 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Connie Brown, Gwenda L. Tschirhart, Kristen Spies, Crystal Denman, Trudy Hancock, Kathryn Nealy, Bob Reeves, Vicki T. Vogel, Mary Hope Barrera amending, filed by Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Elena Keane, Jane Doe #2, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Efren Gomez, Julieta Garibay, Maria Yolisma Garcia, UnidosUS, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Jane Doe #1, Lorena Tule-Romain, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.(rg)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING JOINT ADVISORY FROM COUNTY DEFENDANTS re #62 Advisory to the Court filed by Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Kirsten Spies, Laura Wise, Janet Torres, Pamela Ohlendorf, Karen Nelson, Cheryl E Johnson, Kim Rinn, Terri Hefner, Beth Rothermel.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 62 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Terri Hefner, Cheryl E Johnson, Karen Nelson, Pamela Ohlendorf, Kim Rinn, Beth Rothermel, Kirsten Spies, Janet Torres, Laura Wise. (Magee, Jason)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING #20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C) (rg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE In Opposition to Keith Ingram and David Whitley's Motion to Dismiss,(#27 filed in Case SA-19-CV-171) filed by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, re #59 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation In Response to Defendants David Whitley and Keith Ingram's Motion to Dismiss filed by Consol Plaintiff JOLT Initiative, Consol Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Texas, Consol Plaintiff Nivien Saleh, Consol Plaintiff MOVE Texas Civic Fund (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buser-Clancy, Thomas) Modified on 2/27/2019 (rg). Modified on 2/27/2019 (rg).
February 26, 2019 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation In Response to Defendants David Whitley and Keith Ingram's Motion to Dismiss by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Entry of Prohibitory Temporary Restraining Order against Galveston, Blanco, and Smith Counties by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Salmon, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fred Biery: Motion Hearing continued on 2/25/2019 re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(kh)
February 25, 2019 Filing 57 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2/25/2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Poage, Telephone number: 210-244-5036 Email: chris_poage@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/18/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2019, (Poage, Chris)
February 25, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Exhibit 84 to Garibay TRO by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 84 to Garibay TRO Application - Decl. of Remi Garza)(Perales, Nina)
February 25, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to Transferred Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction by Greg Abbot, Keith Ingram, Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 23, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Clancy for Stuart Naifeh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11801322) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Clancy, Thomas)
February 23, 2019 Filing 52 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Vera, Luis)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly Danahy for Julie Hilberg,Molly Danahy for National League of United Latin American Citizens,Molly Danahy for Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Clancy for Jennifer Nwachukwu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11801227) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Clancy, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Clancy for Jon Greenbaum ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11801225) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Clancy, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Clancy for Ezra Rosenberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11801221) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Clancy, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Clancy for Brendan Downes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11801219) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Clancy, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Clancy for Sophia Lin Lakin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11801216) by on behalf of JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Clancy, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response)(Perales, Nina)
February 22, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Participate in Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS (Salmon, John) Modified on 2/25/2019 (rg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 44 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Whitley. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 22, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Harrison Stevens for Joaquin Gonzalez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11800400) by on behalf of MOVE Texas Civic Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Rebecca)
February 22, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Request to Participate by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh (Clancy, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (Setting Status/Scheduling Conference for 3/11/2019 9:00 AM before Judge Fred Biery). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11798447) by on behalf of Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - cause numbers SA-19-CA-74-FB, SA-19-CA-59-FB, and SA-19-CA-71-FB are CONSOLIDATED, and all future filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE SA-19-CA-74-FB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause numbers SA-19-CA-159-FB and SA-19-CA-171-FB are ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Fred Biery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (kh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 36 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Betsy Schonhoff. (Jackson, Jennifer)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Elena Keane, La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (rg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fred Biery: Motion Hearing Continued and held on 2/20/2019 re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(rg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 34 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2/20/2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Poage, Telephone number: 210-244-5036 Email: chris_poage@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/13/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2019, (Poage, Chris)
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2/19/2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Poage, Telephone number: 210-244-5036 Email: chris_poage@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/13/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2019, (Poage, Chris)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order "Oral" ORDER by Judge Fred Biery GRANTING #30 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING #31 Motion for Protective Order subject to modification by the Court. (kh)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order "Oral" ORDER DENYING #29 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Evidence and Witnesses; DENYING to continue hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Fred Biery. (kh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fred Biery: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2019 re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(rg)
February 18, 2019 Filing 31 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Joinder to Defendants' Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Gayatri Vasan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 18, 2019 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 18, 2019 Filing 29 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Certain Evidence and Witnesses or to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 18, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Plaintiff Julie Hilberg, Plaintiff National League of United Latin American Citizens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compilation of County Activity)(Vera, Luis)
February 18, 2019 Filing 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant David Whitley, Defendant Ken Paxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: 2/15/19 K. Ingram Email, #2 Proposed Order)(Vera, Luis)
February 14, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #17 Order by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 14, 2019 Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ken Paxton, David Whitley, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Plaintiff Julie Hilberg, Plaintiff National League of United Latin American Citizens (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 14, 2019 Filing 24 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Vera, Luis)
February 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Lupe Torres (LULAC) in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lupe Torres (LULAC))(Vera, Luis)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ADVISORY ORDER Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on or before February 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Advisory Concerning Planning for February 19 Hearing. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ken Paxton, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daaboul, Rola)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens. Ken Paxton served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Dunn, Chad)
February 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines: David Whitley answer due 2/25/2019. (rg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens. David Whitley served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Dunn, Chad) Modified on 2/5/2019 (rg).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Set Motion Hearing for #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 9:00 AM before Judge Fred Biery). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Order re Motion for Class Certification [ECF No. 10] by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens (Vera, Luis) Modified on 2/5/2019 (rg).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark P. Gaber and Danielle M. Lang for Julie Hilber, National League of United Latin American Citizens and Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hilberg Declaration, #2 Exhibit B: Vera Declaration, #3 Exhibit C: Hicks Declaration, #4 Exhibit D: Dunn Declaration, #5 Exhibit E: Richards Declaration, #6 Exhibit F: Gaber Declaration)(Vera, Luis)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Renea Hicks on behalf of Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. Attorney Max Renea Hicks added to party Julie Hilberg(pty:pla), Attorney Max Renea Hicks added to party National League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Max Renea Hicks added to party Texas League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla) (Hicks, Max)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pasternak Declaration and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B: Hilberg Declaration, #3 Exhibit C: Elfant Declaration)(Vera, Luis)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11718485) by on behalf of Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Dunn, Chad)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11718448) by on behalf of Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Dunn, Chad)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Whitley. (rg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ken Paxton. (rg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Julie Hilberg, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. (Vera, Luis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ken Paxton, David Whitley amending #1 Complaint, filed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, National League of United Latin American Citizens, Julie Hilberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 500047794), filed by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, National League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
January 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (dtg)
January 29, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)
January 29, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas League of United Latin American Citizens et al v. Whitley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Represented By: David R. Richards
Represented By: Danielle M. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Molly Danahy
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Represented By: David R. Richards
Represented By: Danielle M. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Whitley
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Rola Daaboul
Represented By: Christopher D. Hilton
Represented By: Michael Christopher Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Rola Daaboul
Represented By: Christopher D. Hilton
Represented By: Michael Christopher Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Cheryl Johnson
Represented By: Barry C Willey
Represented By: Robert Barron Boemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Julieta Garibay
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Texas
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Joaquin Robert Gonzalez
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lorena Tule-Romain
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Maria Felicitas Barbosa
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: UnidosUS
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Texas State Conference of NAACP Units
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Joaquin Robert Gonzalez
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nivien Saleh
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Joaquin Robert Gonzalez
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: MOVE Texas Civic Fund
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Joaquin Robert Gonzalez
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: La Union De Pueblo Entero, Inc.
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Organization of Chinese Americans-Greater Houston
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Maria Yolisma Garcia
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Viridiana Tule Carrizales
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Martine Hummel
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe #3
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe #1
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Efren Gomez
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jane Doe #2
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: JOLT Initiative
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Joaquin Robert Gonzalez
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hilda Castillo
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Elena Keane
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Eri Andriola
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Connie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kim Rinn
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Janet Torres
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Beth Rothermel
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Greg Abbot
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Rola Daaboul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trudy Hancock
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Keith Ingram
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Rola Daaboul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Crystal Denman
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mary Hope Barrera
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Elections Administrator for Harrison County
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vicki T. Vogel
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kathryn Nealy
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Karen Nelson
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Gwenda L. Tschirhart
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kristen Spies
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cheryl E Johnson
Represented By: Barry C Willey
Represented By: Robert Barron Boemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Pamela Ohlendorf
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Terri Hefner
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Betsy Schonhoff
Represented By: Jennifer Settle Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gayatri Vasan
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Rola Daaboul
Represented By: Christopher D. Hilton
Represented By: Michael Christopher Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?