Padilla v. Davis
Plaintiff: Ismael Hernandez Padilla
Defendant: TDCJ, Director Lorie Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00169
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 PRO SE RESPONSE to #9 Order to Show Cause by Ismael Hernandez Padilla. (aej)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT, Copy routed to Operations Department. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS, Copy routed to Operations Department. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Ismael Hernandez Padilla. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #2 filed by Ismael Hernandez Padilla. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION for Judgment by Ismael Hernandez Padilla. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
February 21, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
February 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of California; Case Number 4:18-cv-06578.
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/19. (certificate of service attached)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/21/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ismael Hernandez Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/21/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/6/2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/21/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ismael Hernandez Padilla. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/21/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lorie Davis. Filed by Ismael Hernandez Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDCJ, Director Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Hernandez Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?