Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company v. Heflin et al

Plaintiff: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert Reed, John Alan Heflin and Barbara Barker
Case Number: 5:2019cv00206
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. Robert Reed served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Kennedy, Franklin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. Barbara Barker served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Kennedy, Franklin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. John Alan Heflin served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. (Kennedy, Franklin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Barbara Barker. (mgr)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Franklin)
March 1, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11829039). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company v. Heflin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Alan Heflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Dunn Bradley
Represented By: Franklin M. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?