Enriquez v. Rahul et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Enriquez
Defendant: Rahul Patel, Transcontinental Energy Resource, LLC and Transcontinental Oil & Gas, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00485
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rahul Patel, Transcontinental Energy Resource, LLC, Transcontinental Oil & Gas, LLC.(Bracken, Douglas)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rahul Patel answer due 6/17/2019; Transcontinental Energy Resource, LLC answer due 6/17/2019; Transcontinental Oil & Gas, LLC answer due 6/17/2019. (aej)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is June 17, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rahul Patel, Transcontinental Energy Resource, LLC, Transcontinental Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bracken, Douglas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Transcontinental Oil & Gas, LLC. (aej)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Transcontinental Energy Resource, LLC. (aej)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rahul Patel. (aej)
May 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (aej)
May 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Antonio Enriquez. (Sanford, Josh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12083114), filed by Antonio Enriquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Josh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez v. Rahul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Patel
Represented By: Douglas C. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Energy Resource, LLC
Represented By: Douglas C. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Douglas C. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Enriquez
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Merideth Q. McEntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?