911 Auto Centers LLC et al v. Depositors Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: 911 Auto Centers LLC and Martin Gutierrez, Jr.
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company and Tiffany Blue
Case Number: 5:2019cv00498
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 8/8/2019,, Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019,, Discovery due by 2/3/2020,, Joinder of Parties due by 9/9/2019,, Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2020,)The Court will set the case for trial by separate order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Recommendations by Depositors Insurance Company. (Kemp, Patrick)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
May 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Depositors Insurance Company. (Wall, Robert)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Depositors Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12097905), filed by Depositors Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kemp, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 911 Auto Centers LLC et al v. Depositors Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Daniel DiLizia
Represented By: Patrick M. Kemp
Represented By: Robert Glen Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 911 Auto Centers LLC
Represented By: Juan Gabriel Ortiz
Represented By: Martin J. Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Gutierrez, Jr.
Represented By: Juan Gabriel Ortiz
Represented By: Martin J. Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?