Pearsall Inn & Suites v. Great American Insurance Company of New York
Plaintiff: Pearsall Inn & Suites
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 5:2019cv00501
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgmentand any appropriate supporting documents on or before September 2,2019.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Great American Insurance Company of New York (Tippett, Todd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 8/9/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2019, Discovery due by 2/7/2020, Motions due by 3/6/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (O'Brien, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
May 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (O'Brien, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great American Insurance Company of New York (Filing fee Received $400 Receipt # 0542-12099361), filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Disclosure Statement)(O'Brien, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearsall Inn & Suites v. Great American Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearsall Inn & Suites
Represented By: Shaun W. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Michael Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Todd M. Tippett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?