Acosta v. Ben E. Keith Company

Petitioner: R. Alexander Acosta
Respondent: Ben E. Keith Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00527
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING the Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum re #1 Complaint, filed by R. Alexander Acosta, Motions terminated: This case is to remain open, as the Court will retain jurisdictionpending resolution of this matter. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2019 re #3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by R. Alexander Acosta (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(wg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #1 Complaint, Reply to Response to Petition to Enforce OSHA Subpoena by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Declaration of Monica Munoz)(Vieyra, Sheryl)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter to (Mini Kapoor) as to Ben E. Keith Company. (wg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ben E. Keith Company. (Deffebach, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support, by Ben E. Keith Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deffebach, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ben E. Keith Company.(Deffebach, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Set Hearing: Hearing on Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena set for 6/18/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Expedite Hearing entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. This case is set for a hearing on Tuesday, June 18, 2019 at 10:30 AM. in Courtroom Number 3, John H. Wood, Jr. United States Courthouse, 655 E. Cesar Chavez Blvd., San Antonio, Texas 78206. Respondent's deadline to file any response and objection to the enforcement petition is June 6, 2019. Petitioner's deadline to file any reply is June 13, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdxr)
May 17, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***EDIT THE TEXT TO REMOVE THE FILING FEE LANGUAGE*** re #1 Complaint. (bc)
May 16, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Hearing by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieyra, Sheryl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support of Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued by the Occupational Safety and Health Administration by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Alejandro Porter)(Vieyra, Sheryl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued by the Occupational Safety and Health Administration No Summons requested at this time, filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Exhibit B - BEK Response to Subpoena, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vieyra, Sheryl) Modified on 5/17/2019 To edit text and remove filing fee language. (bc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Ben E. Keith Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Sheryl L. Vieyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben E. Keith Company
Represented By: Matthew T. Deffebach
Represented By: Laura E. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?