Lalla v. G & H Towing
Plaintiff: Mr. Curtis Lalla and Curtis Lalla
Defendant: G & M Towing and G & H Towing Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00542
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by G & H Towing Company, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant G & H Towing Company (Porterfield, Tara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Curtis Lalla, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant G & H Towing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Melton, John)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by G & H Towing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steven Huttman, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Elaine Lauzon, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Porterfield, Tara)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to G & H Towing Company. (mgr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Curtis Lalla. (Melton, John)
May 20, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12132601). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Curtis Lalla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lalla v. G & H Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Curtis Lalla
Represented By: John F. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lalla
Represented By: John F. Melton
Represented By: Michael Balcezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & M Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & H Towing Company
Represented By: Tara Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?