Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan et al v. Triple C Plumbing Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Welfare Fund, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Unio nNo. 142 Profit Sharing Plan and Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Profit Sharing Plan
Defendant: Triple C Plumbing Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00551
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Profit Sharing Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Welfare Fund. Triple C Plumbing Contractors, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Selwyn, Douglas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Triple C Plumbing Contractors, Inc.. (mgr)
May 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
May 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Unio nNo. 142 Profit Sharing Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Welfare Fund. (Selwyn, Douglas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Unio nNo. 142 Profit Sharing Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Welfare Fund. (Selwyn, Douglas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12142836), filed by Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Unio nNo. 142 Profit Sharing Plan, Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Selwyn, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan et al v. Triple C Plumbing Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple C Plumbing Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Douglas M. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Pension Plan
Represented By: Douglas M. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Unio nNo. 142 Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Douglas M. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A.P.P. Local Union No. 142 Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Douglas M. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?