Sharifan v. Sharifan
Plaintiff: Abdolrahim Sharifan
Defendant: Suzette Sharifan
Petitioner: Lloyd Kelley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00566
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abdolrahim Sharifan (Hill, Martyn)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Lloyd Kelley. (mgr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Intervene by Lloyd Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order, #3 copy of envelope)(mgr)
May 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
May 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Abdolrahim Sharifan. (Hill, Martyn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Abdolrahim Sharifan. (Hill, Martyn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Request to Compel Arbitration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12155624). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Abdolrahim Sharifan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Hill, Martyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharifan v. Sharifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzette Sharifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdolrahim Sharifan
Represented By: Martyn B. Hill
Represented By: Michael A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lloyd Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?