Maria Montelongo v. My Financial Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maira Montelongo
Defendant: My Financial Solutions LLC, Student Renew LLC and Angela Mirabella
Case Number: 5:2019cv00577
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Angela Mirabella, re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Angela Mirabella (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vana, Dan)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Maira Montelongo, re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Angela Mirabella Response to Dismissal,Affidavit,Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Personal Jurisdiction Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Response to Dismissal)(McRae, Leland)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after anydefendant has appeared. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT Order to #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Joe Vana ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12349097) by Angela Mirabella, My Financial Solutions LLC, Student Renew LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vana, Dan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Joe Vana ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12349097) by on behalf of Angela Mirabella, My Financial Solutions LLC, Student Renew LLC. (Vana, Dan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Joe Vana ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12348931) by on behalf of Angela Mirabella, My Financial Solutions LLC, Student Renew LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vana, Dan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Dan Joe Vana added to party My Financial Solutions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dan Joe Vana added to party Student Renew LLC(pty:dft) by Angela Mirabella, My Financial Solutions LLC, Student Renew LLC.(Vana, Dan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Angela Mirabella. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Dismiss)(Vana, Dan)
June 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maira Montelongo. All DEFENDANT'S. (McRae, Leland) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (wg).
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Angela Mirabella, My Financial Solutions LLC, Student Renew LLC. (wg)
May 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
May 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maira Montelongo. Summons Request (McRae, Leland) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/29/2019) (wg).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 5:19-cv-00577 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12164464), filed by Maira Montelongo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McRae, Leland) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (wg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Montelongo v. My Financial Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Financial Solutions LLC
Represented By: Dan Joe Vana
Represented By: Joseph A. Namikas
Represented By: Chuck Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Student Renew LLC
Represented By: Dan Joe Vana
Represented By: Joseph A. Namikas
Represented By: Chuck Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Mirabella
Represented By: Dan Joe Vana
Represented By: Joseph A. Namikas
Represented By: Chuck Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maira Montelongo
Represented By: Leland Garrett McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?